Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1517110

EP1517110 - Combined protection system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  19.08.2011
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2011Opposition rejectedpublished on 21.09.2011  [2011/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEKE Technologie GmbH
Erasmusstr. 16
79098 Freiburg / DE
[2008/01]
Former [2005/12]For all designated states
GEKE Technologie GmbH
Erasmusstr. 16
79098 Freiburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kellner, Gerd
Dr.-Helmut-Junghans-Strasse 49/1
78713 Schramberg / DE
02 / Weihrauch, Achim
Schanzstrasse 17
79588 Efringen-Kirchen / DE
 [2005/12]
Representative(s)Söltenfuss, Dirk Christian , et al
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/14]Söltenfuss, Dirk Christian , et al
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2005/12]Söltenfuss, Dirk, Christian, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwaltskanzlei Söltenfuss, Zweibrückenstrasse 6
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date03020528.016.09.2003
[2005/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1517110
Date:23.03.2005
Language:DE
[2005/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1517110
Date:02.01.2008
Language:DE
[2008/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:F41H5/007
[2005/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/12]
TitleGerman:Kombinierte Schutzanordnung[2005/12]
English:Combined protection system[2005/12]
French:Système de protection combiné[2005/12]
Examination procedure29.07.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/39]
03.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2007Fee for grant paid
21.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.09.2008   
Dynamit Nobel Defence GmbH
Dr. Hermann-Fleck-Allee
57299 Burbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Scherzberg, Andreas Hans
Chemetall GmbH
Patente, Marken & Lizenzen
Trakehner Strasse 3
60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/45]
Opponent(s)01  24.09.2008   
Dynamit Nobel Defence GmbH
Dr. Hermann-Fleck-Allee
57299 Burbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Scherzberg, Andreas Hans
Chemetall GmbH Patente, Marken & Lizenzen Trakehner Strasse 3
60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE
07.11.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.07.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.04.2010Date of oral proceedings
04.05.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.05.2010Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
13.05.2011Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/38]
Appeal following opposition15.07.2010Appeal received No.  T1535/10
16.09.2010Statement of grounds filed
13.05.2011Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible
13.05.2011Date of oral proceedings
04.05.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY02.01.2008
CZ02.01.2008
EE02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
PT02.06.2008
HU03.07.2008
LU16.09.2008
BE30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
[2010/34]
Former [2010/32]CY02.01.2008
CZ02.01.2008
EE02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
PT02.06.2008
LU16.09.2008
BE30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2009/34]CY02.01.2008
CZ02.01.2008
EE02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
PT02.06.2008
BE30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2009/32]CZ02.01.2008
EE02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
PT02.06.2008
BE30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2009/22]CZ02.01.2008
EE02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
PT02.06.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2009/20]CZ02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
PT02.06.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2008/50]CZ02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
PT02.06.2008
Former [2008/48]FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
PT02.06.2008
Former [2008/42]FI02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
PT02.06.2008
Former [2008/39]FI02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
Former [2008/26]SI02.01.2008
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0689028  (ISRAEL STATE [IL]) [X] 1-6,8,10,18,19,23-28,31,33,35-39,50 * abstract * * column 1, lines 4-29 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 19 * * column 4, lines 3-10,19-22,34-55 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 5 * * column 5, lines 44-48 * * column 6, lines 23,28-40 * * figures 1,3,4 * [A] 12;
 [XA]GB2191277  (ROYAL ORDNANCE PLC) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,13-16,30,32,35,36,40-44,47,49,51,52 * abstract * * page 1, lines 6-22,40-44,56-60,67-90,101-120 * * page 1, line 121 - page 2, line 3 * * page 2, lines 14-16,45-52 * * figure 1 * [A] 34,51;
 [XA]EP0860678  (DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO [DE]) [X] 1-8,10,11,19-23,31,35,45,46 * abstract * * column 1, lines 3-9 * * column 2, lines 23-54 * * column 3, lines 12-16,25-29,44-58 * * column 4, lines 8,9,16-22,35 * * figure 1 * [A] 53;
 [XA]DE10119596  (DIEHL MUNITIONSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,13-18,23-28,31,32,35 * abstract * * column 1, lines 17-21 * * column 2, lines 1-62 * * column 3, lines 23-35 * * figures 1-4,6 * [A] 29;
 [A]US5576508  (KORPI JOHN G [US]) [A] 47,49 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0379080  (ISRAEL STATE [IL])
by applicantDE19956197
 EP0922924
 EP0379080
 DE4114809
 DE19509899