Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1517110 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1517110



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 445
16.08.2011 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
02.08.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
30.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
29.07.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.07.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 22
19.05.2011 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
13.05.2011 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
05.05.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.05.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.05.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.02.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
04.02.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.02.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
03.02.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.02.2011 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 5
27.01.2011 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.01.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
23.12.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.12.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
16.12.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
10.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.11.2010 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 2
08.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.10.2010 F3047 Inadmissibility of the appeal: diverse Appeal 4
06.10.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.09.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
23.09.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.09.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
16.09.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
16.09.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
21.07.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
21.07.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.07.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
15.07.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.05.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.05.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.05.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.05.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
04.05.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
04.05.2010 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
04.05.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
04.05.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.05.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.05.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
04.05.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.04.2010 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
05.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.03.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
07.01.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.12.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.12.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.12.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.12.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
08.12.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.08.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2009 Claims Opposition 2
24.07.2009 Claims Opposition 3
24.07.2009 Claims Opposition 2
24.07.2009 Claims Opposition 3
24.07.2009 Claims Opposition 4
24.07.2009 Claims Opposition 2
24.07.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 17
10.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
26.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2009 Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent/failure to reply to a notice of opposition Opposition 2
07.11.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.11.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.09.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 8
26.09.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
26.09.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
24.09.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 8
27.02.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.02.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
06.12.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.11.2007 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
20.11.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.11.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
02.08.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
02.08.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
02.08.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
11.07.2007 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.11.2006 Claims Search / examination 5
28.11.2006 Description Search / examination 2
28.11.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.08.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
03.08.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.07.2005 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
29.07.2005 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
30.03.2005 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
09.02.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
17.03.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.01.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
29.01.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.01.2004 European search report Search / examination 2
28.01.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
26.11.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.11.2003 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
15.10.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.10.2003 Communication regarding the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 1
02.10.2003 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
02.10.2003 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
02.10.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.09.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 8
16.09.2003 Description Search / examination 34
16.09.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.09.2003 Drawings Search / examination 7
16.09.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6