Auszug aus dem europäischen Patentregister

Rechtsstand: EP1491088

Benannte Vertragsstaaten AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 MC 
 NL 
 PT 
 RO 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 TR 
Prüfungsverfahren20.07.2005Veröffentlichungs-/Druckkostengebühr entrichtet
Entrichtete GebührenJahresgebühr
22.07.2005Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03
Europäisches Patent erteilt12.10.2005
Einspruchsverfahren13.07.2006Kein Einspruch fristgerecht eingelegt veröffentlicht am 20.09.2006 
INPADOC-Daten   TooltipDas EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden.
Datum des Ereignisses:29.12.2004 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20040720
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.12.2004 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.12.2004 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK
 
Datum des Ereignisses:02.09.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK DE 1072525 HK
Code Expl.: REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG
 
Datum des Ereignisses:21.09.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Datum des Ereignisses:21.09.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
EXTENSION STATE:AL
Payment DATE:20050621
 
Datum des Ereignisses:21.09.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
EXTENSION STATE:LT
Payment DATE:20050621
 
Datum des Ereignisses:21.09.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
EXTENSION STATE:LV
Payment DATE:20050621
 
Datum des Ereignisses:21.09.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
EXTENSION STATE:MK
Payment DATE:20050621
 
Datum des Ereignisses:12.10.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Datum des Ereignisses:12.10.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK
 
Datum des Ereignisses:12.10.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Datum des Ereignisses:14.10.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Datum des Ereignisses:18.10.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Datum des Ereignisses:02.11.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Datum des Ereignisses:07.11.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Datum des Ereignisses:15.11.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:NOVAGRAAF INTERNATIONAL SA
 
Datum des Ereignisses:17.11.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:60301876
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20051117
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Datum des Ereignisses:15.12.2005 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E000140 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20051020
 
Datum des Ereignisses:01.02.2006 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20050403650 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
 
Datum des Ereignisses:28.02.2006 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E000162 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Datum des Ereignisses:01.03.2006 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2247470 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Datum des Ereignisses:07.03.2006 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG RO EPE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA
 
Datum des Ereignisses:07.04.2006 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK GR 1072525 HK
Code Expl.:+STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG
 
Datum des Ereignisses:21.04.2006 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Datum des Ereignisses:20.09.2006 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20060713
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.05.2011 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20100917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.05.2011 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20100813
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.05.2011 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:HIS MAJESTY KING BHUMIBOL, ADULYADEJ OF THAILAND
Free Format Text:HIS MAJESTY KING BHUMIBOL, ADULYADEJ OF THAILAND#CHITRALADA VILLA, DUSIT PALACE#BANGKOK 10303 (TH) -TRANSFER TO- HIS MAJESTY KING BHUMIBOL, ADULYADEJ OF THAILAND#CHITRALADA VILLA, DUSIT PALACE#BANGKOK 10303 (TH)
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.07.2011 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Effective DATE:20110616
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2011 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20110905
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2011 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20110728
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.11.2011 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20110912
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20120917
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20120911
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20120801
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20120731
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20120925
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20120808
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20120917
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20120731
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.11.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20120802
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.11.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20120910
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.11.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20120813
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.11.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20120801
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.11.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20120928
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.12.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20120917
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.12.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20121004
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.12.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20120917
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.12.2012 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20120906
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.01.2013 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20120912
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.01.2013 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20120319
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.01.2013 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20121123
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.01.2013 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20120912
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.03.2013 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20120828
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Datum des Ereignisses:25.03.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT MM4A
Code Expl.:-ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT
Free Format Text:LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES
Effective DATE:20140317
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.03.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:*HIS MAJESTY KING BHUMIBOL ADULYADEJ OF THAILAND
Effective DATE:20130930
 
Datum des Ereignisses:16.04.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL V1
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20140401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:25.04.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MM9D
Code Expl.:-CANCELLATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENT
Effective DATE:20130917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.04.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.04.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130930
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.04.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130918
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.04.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.04.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.04.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.04.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Datum des Ereignisses:05.05.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EBP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT LAPSED
Effective DATE:20130930
 
Datum des Ereignisses:15.05.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MM01 306188 AT T
Code Expl.:-LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20130917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:22.05.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR ML 20050403650 GR
Code Expl.:-LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES
Effective DATE:20140403
 
Datum des Ereignisses:28.05.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20130917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.05.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SI KO00
Code Expl.:-LAPSE OF PATENT
Effective DATE:20140429
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.05.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:03.06.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK MM4A E 318 SK
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES
Effective DATE:20130917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:16.06.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE MM4A E000140 EE
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BY NOT PAYING THE ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20130930
 
Datum des Ereignisses:26.06.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 60301876 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20140401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:27.06.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20140530
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.06.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140317
 
Datum des Ereignisses:02.07.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.07.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130930
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.07.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130930
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.07.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130930
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.07.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130930
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.07.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.07.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.08.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.08.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130918
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.08.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.08.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130930
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.08.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.08.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.08.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140403
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.08.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140630
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.08.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.09.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130930
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.09.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130918
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140930
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130930
 
Datum des Ereignisses:09.07.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20150709
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.07.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130918
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.07.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130917
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.09.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130917