Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1491166

EP1491166 - Adjusting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2006
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer GmbH
Sulzer Allee 8
8404 Winterthur / CH
[2005/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Overes, Thomas
Hegifeldstrasse 89
8404 Winterthur / CH
 [2005/01]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2005/01]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Application number, filing date03020895.315.09.2003
[2005/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1491166
Date:29.12.2004
Language:DE
[2004/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1491166
Date:02.03.2005
Language:DE
[2005/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/46
[2005/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2005/09]
Former [2005/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Einstellvorrichtung[2005/01]
English:Adjusting device[2005/01]
French:Dispositif d'ajustage[2005/01]
Examination procedure26.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/53]
19.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.2004Fee for grant paid
19.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08]
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0979636  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON PROFESSIONAL) [DA] 1-19 * figures 2,3 * * column 3, line 49 - line 58 * * column 4, line 40 - line 55 *;
 [A]US5688280  (BOOTH JR ROBERT E ET AL) [A] 1-19 * figures 3,4,6 * * column 1, line 52 - line 53 * * column 3, line 1 - line 2 * * column 4, line 29 - line 45 * * column 5, line 43 - line 46 *;
 [A]WO0217826  (HERZOG ROLAND ;CORTELLESSA MAURIZIO (CH); STRATEC MEDICAL AG (CH);) [A] 1-19 * figure 1 * * siehe Zusammenfassung *;
 [A]US5250050  (EWALD FREDERICK C ET AL) [A] 1-19 * figures 15-17 * * column 5, line 59 - line 66 *