Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1402787

EP1402787 - Ximenynic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2012
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.10.2012  [2012/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lipid Nutrition B.V.
Hogeweg 1
1521 AZ Wormerveer / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]For all designated states
Lipid Nutrition B.V.
Hogeweg 1
1521 AZ Wormerveer / NL
Former [2004/14]For all designated states
LODERS CROKLAAN B.V.
Hogeweg 1
1521 AZ Wormerveer / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Eggink, Marco
Loders Croklaan B.V. Hogeweg 1
1521 AZ Wormerveer / NL
02 / Koenen, Claudia
Loders Croklaan B.V. Hogeweg 1
1521 AZ Wormerveer / NL
03 / Stam, Wiro
Loders Croklaan B.V. Hogeweg 1
1521 AZ Wormerveer / NL
04 / Rogers, Julia
Unilever R&D Colworth Colworth House
Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
05 / Schmid, Ulrike
Loders Croklaan B.V. Hogeweg 1
1521 AZ Wormerveer / NL
06 / Peilow, Anne
Unilever R&D Colworth Colworth House
Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
07 / Bosley, John
43 Kettering rd. Islip
Kettering Northants NN14 3JT / GB
 [2004/14]
Representative(s)Stevens, Ian Edward , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/35]Stevens, Ian Edward , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2010/17]Reynolds, Julian David , et al
Hammonds LLP 7 Devonshire Square
London EC2M 4YH / GB
Former [2004/14]Schneider, Michael , et al
HAMMONDS, Rechtsanwälte/Patentanwälte, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 17
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date03021163.523.09.2003
[2004/14]
Priority number, dateEP2002025674927.09.2002         Original published format: EP 02256749
EP2002002859520.12.2002         Original published format: EP 02028595
[2004/16]
Former [2004/14]EP2002025674927.09.2002
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1402787
Date:31.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:A23D9/00, A23D7/00, C11B1/10, C11B1/02, C11C1/04, A23L1/30
[2004/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/14]
TitleGerman:Ximeninsäure[2004/14]
English:Ximenynic acid[2004/14]
French:Acide Ximenynique[2004/14]
Examination procedure30.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/49]
14.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/40]
15.05.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/40]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2005
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201109   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US3047401  (BAUR FREDRIC J) [A] 2-14 * column 3, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]US5994404  (COUPLAND KEITH [GB]) [A] 2-14 * table 5 *;
 [X]  LIGTHELM, S. P., HORN, D. H. S., SCHWARTZ, H. M., AND VON HOLDT, M. M., "A chemical study of the fruits of three south african ximenia species with special reference to the kernel oils", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE., ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. BARKING., GB, (1954), vol. 5, ISSN 0022-5142, pages 281 - 288, XP008014372 [X] 1-6,8-10,12,14,19-21 * table 3 * * page 281, paragraphs 1,2 *
 [X]  JONES, G. P., WATSON, T. G., SINCLAIR, A. J., BIRKETT, A., DUNT, N., NAIR, S.S.D., AND TONKIN, S. Y., "SANTALBIC ACID FRoM QUANDONG KERNELS AND OIL FED TO RATS AFFECTS KIDNEY AND LIVER P450", ASIA PACIFIC JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, (1999), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 211 - 215, XP001148754 [X] 1,4-6,8,10,12,14,19-21 * page 211, columns 1-2 * * table 2 * * page 215, column 1, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1440-6047.1999.00112.x
 [X]  LIE KEN JIE, M. S. F., PASHA, M. K., AHMAD, F., "Ultrasound assisted synthesis of santalbic acid and a study of triacylglycerol species in santalum album (Linn.) Seed Oil", LIPIDS, CHAMPAIGN, IL, US, (1996), vol. 31, no. 10, ISSN 0024-4201, pages 1083 - 1089, XP008014370 [X] 1,4-6,12,19-21 * table 3 * * page 1083, column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02522466
 [X]  BOMBARDELLI E ET AL, "MICROVASCULOKINETIC ACTIVITY OF XIMENYNIC ACID ETHYL ESTER", FITOTERAPIA, IDB HOLDING, MILAN, IT, (1994), vol. 65, no. 3, ISSN 0367-326X, pages 195 - 201, XP001104828 [X] 1,7,12 * page 196, paragraphs 2-5 * * page 197, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 200, paragraph 1 *
 [X]  LIU, Y. D., LONGMORE, R. B., BODDY, M. R., AND FOX, J. E. D., "Separation and identification of trixymenynin from Santalum spicatum R. Br.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY., AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY. CHAMPAIGN., US, (1997), vol. 74, no. 10, ISSN 0003-021X, pages 1269 - 1272, XP002232839 [X] 1,4-6,19-21 * page 1272, column 1, paragraph 2; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11746-997-0056-6
 [X]  AFOLABI, O. A., OLOGUNDE, M. O., ANDERSON, W. A., READ, J. S., DACOSTA, M. D., EPPS, F. A., AND AYORINDE, F. O., "The use of lipase (acetone powder) form Veronia galamensis in the fatty acid analysis of Seed oils", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY. (INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNICAL AND CHEMICAL PROCESSES), ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. BARKING., GB, (1991), vol. 51, ISSN 0268-2575, pages 41 - 46, XP002232840 [X] 13 * page 43, paragraphs 1,2 *
 [X]  LIU, Y., A study of the biochemical development and toxicology of the seed of santalum spicatum, PERTH, AUSTRALIA, CURTIN UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY, XP002261196 [X] 15,16,19,21-23,25 * abstract * * page 109, paragraph 1 * * page 114, paragraph 2 *
 [A]  FOGLIA, T. A., JONES, K. C., AND SONNET, P. E., "Selectivity of lipases: Isolation of fatty acids form castor, coriander, and meadowfoam oils.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF LIPID SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 102, pages 612 - 617, XP000959999 [A] 13 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1438-9312(200010)102:10<612::AID-EJLT612>3.3.CO;2-L
by applicantWO9817293
 US5104655
 FR2633516
    LIGTHELM ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE., (1954), vol. 5, pages 281 - 288,
    JONES ET AL., ASIA PACIFIC JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, (1999), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 211 - 215,
    LIE KEN JIE ET AL., LIPIDS, (1996), vol. 31, no. 10, pages 1083 - 1089,
    BOMBARDELLI ET AL., FITOTERAPIA, IDB HOLDING, MILAN, IT, (1994), vol. 65, no. 3, pages 195 - 201,
    LIU ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY., (1997), vol. 74, no. 10, pages 1269 - 1272,
    AFOLABI ET AL., "Journal of Chemical Technology and Biotechnology", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNICAL AND CHEMICAL PROCESSES, (1991), vol. 51, pages 41 - 46,
    LIU, Y., CURTIN UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY, PERTH, AUSTRALIA, (1997),