Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1378265 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1378265



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1299
16.02.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
05.02.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
05.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.01.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 2
08.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.01.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 21
05.01.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.01.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.10.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.10.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.10.2015 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 4
25.09.2015 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 7
31.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 51
25.08.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 51
25.08.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
06.08.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
06.08.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
06.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.07.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.07.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
30.07.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
24.07.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
16.07.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
16.07.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
03.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.07.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
01.07.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
26.06.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
06.03.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.02.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
01.02.2012 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
28.12.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.12.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
20.05.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.05.2011 Claims Appeal 3
16.05.2011 Claims Appeal 3
16.05.2011 Claims Appeal 3
16.05.2011 Claims Appeal 3
16.05.2011 Claims Appeal 3
16.05.2011 Claims Appeal 3
16.05.2011 Claims Appeal 3
16.05.2011 Claims Appeal 3
16.05.2011 Claims Appeal 3
16.05.2011 Claims Appeal 3
16.05.2011 Claims Appeal 4
16.05.2011 Claims Appeal 3
16.05.2011 Claims Appeal 3
16.05.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 50
16.05.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
29.03.2011 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
29.03.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.03.2011 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.03.2011 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.03.2011 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.03.2011 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
14.03.2011 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.03.2011 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.03.2011 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.03.2011 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
14.03.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 22
14.03.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 22
11.03.2011 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
28.02.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
04.11.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
02.11.2010 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
26.10.2010 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 1
26.10.2010 Claims Appeal 4
26.10.2010 Claims Appeal 3
26.10.2010 Claims Appeal 3
26.10.2010 Claims Appeal 3
26.10.2010 Claims Appeal 3
26.10.2010 Claims Appeal 3
26.10.2010 Claims Appeal 3
26.10.2010 Claims Appeal 3
26.10.2010 Claims Appeal 3
26.10.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 36
26.10.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
22.10.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 27
06.10.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
24.08.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
09.08.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
04.08.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
26.07.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
22.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.06.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.06.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.06.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
16.06.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
16.06.2010 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 26
16.06.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
16.06.2010 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.06.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.06.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.06.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
16.06.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
16.06.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
16.06.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.06.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
16.06.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.05.2010 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 9
21.05.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
21.05.2010 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
06.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.04.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.04.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.04.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.04.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
27.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
27.04.2010 Request for change of name -opponent Opposition 3
06.04.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
01.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.03.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.01.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
29.01.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
29.01.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.02.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
29.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
29.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.01.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
13.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2008 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
07.08.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
06.08.2008 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.08.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
13.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.06.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
04.04.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.11.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
26.11.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
18.10.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.10.2007 Authorisation Opposition 3
05.10.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 14
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 68
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
21.12.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.11.2006 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
21.09.2006 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
21.09.2006 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
02.08.2006 Description Search / examination 5
02.08.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.08.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
02.08.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.04.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
26.04.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.04.2006 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.04.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 51
04.06.2004 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
04.06.2004 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
19.03.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.03.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.03.2004 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
01.03.2004 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2004 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2004 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
27.01.2004 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
26.01.2004 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
12.01.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.12.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.12.2003 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
26.11.2003 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.11.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
24.11.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.11.2003 European search report Search / examination 2
13.10.2003 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
01.10.2003 Abstract Search / examination 2
01.10.2003 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
01.10.2003 Claims Search / examination 3
01.10.2003 Description Search / examination 33
01.10.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.10.2003 Drawings Search / examination 15
01.10.2003 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
01.10.2003 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 6
12.11.1997 Priority document Search / examination 27
12.11.1997 Translation of priority document Search / examination 37