Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1524690

EP1524690 - Semiconductor package with heat spreader [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.01.2010
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.02.2010  [2010/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2009/11]
Former [2005/16]For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hamid, Abdul Karim Bin Abdul
82 Redhill Lane Nr.05-73
Singapore 150082 / SG
 [2005/16]
Representative(s)Schweiger, Martin , et al
Schweiger & Partners
Intellectual Property Law Firm
Elsenheimer Strasse 1
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/16]Schweiger, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Schweiger & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Karl-Theodor-Strasse 69
80803 München / DE
Application number, filing date03023225.013.10.2003
[2005/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1524690
Date:20.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1524690
Date:11.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/28, H01L23/31, H01L23/427, H01L23/552, H01L23/495, H01L21/60
[2005/16]
Designated contracting statesDE [2006/02]
Former [2005/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Halbleitergehäuse mit Wärmeverteiler[2005/16]
English:Semiconductor package with heat spreader[2005/16]
French:Boîtier à semiconducteur avec dissipateur thermique[2005/16]
Examination procedure18.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/29]
21.10.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.02.2006Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
24.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2009Fee for grant paid
19.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.12.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
16.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.11.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005BG   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005CZ   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005EE   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005FR   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005GB   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005HU   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005RO   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005SI   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005SK   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH11297901  ;
 [Y]US6429513  (WEBSTER STEVEN ET AL) [Y] 1-14 * column 2, line 43 - column 5, line 42; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]US5349237  (SAYKA ANTHONY ET AL) [Y] 1-14 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 10; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH09260555  ;
 [A]US2003006501  (WAKI MASAKI ET AL) [A] 1-14 * figure 8 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11297901 A 19991029 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09260555 A 19971003 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-14 * abstract *