EP1411168 - A method of producing a coated substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trinseo Europe GmbH Zugerstrasse 231 8810 Horgen / CH | [2015/19] |
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states Styron Europe GmbH Bachtobelstrasse 3 8810 Horgen / CH | ||
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | ||
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street, 1790 Building Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urscheler, Robert Hintere Rietswies 60 8810 Horgen / CH | 02 /
Roper III, John A. 2805 Georgetown Drive Midland, Michigan 48642 / US | 03 /
Salminen, Pekka J. Jostenstr. 12 8854 Galgenin / CH | 04 /
Dobler, Francis Im Gassacker 7 8122 Binz / CH | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/14] |
Former [2012/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/36] | Klusmann, Peter Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/17] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 03023328.2 | 15.10.2003 | [2004/17] | Priority number, date | WO2002US33113 | 15.10.2002 Original published format: PCT/US0233/113 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1411168 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1411168 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B05C5/00, B05C9/06, D21H23/48, D21H19/82, B05D1/30, B05D1/36 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
D21H23/48 (EP);
B05D1/305 (EP);
B05D1/36 (EP);
D21H19/82 (EP);
B05C5/007 (EP);
B05C9/06 (EP);
B05D2203/22 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/17] | D21H23/48, D21H19/82, B05D1/30, B05D1/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/14] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines beschichteten Substrats | [2004/17] | English: | A method of producing a coated substrate | [2004/17] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un substrat enduit | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2011 | 31.10.2015 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 15.12.2011 | [2012/04] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2003 | BE | 06.04.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | CY | 06.04.2016 | CZ | 06.04.2016 | DK | 06.04.2016 | EE | 06.04.2016 | ES | 06.04.2016 | IT | 06.04.2016 | MC | 06.04.2016 | NL | 06.04.2016 | RO | 06.04.2016 | SI | 06.04.2016 | SK | 06.04.2016 | TR | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.07.2016 | PT | 08.08.2016 | GB | 15.10.2016 | IE | 15.10.2016 | LU | 15.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 15.10.2003 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
TR | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
GB | 15.10.2016 | ||
IE | 15.10.2016 | ||
LU | 15.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.10.2003 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
GB | 15.10.2016 | ||
IE | 15.10.2016 | ||
LU | 15.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
GB | 15.10.2016 | ||
IE | 15.10.2016 | ||
LU | 15.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/42] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
GB | 15.10.2016 | ||
LU | 15.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
GB | 15.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 06.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB838392 (KASIKA CHEM FAB G M B H); | [A]US3436022 (ERNST ROLF K); | [A]BE852751 (DU PONT) |