blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1396900

EP1396900 - High frequency component and communication apparatus incorporating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.05.2007
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2007Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 06.06.2007  [2007/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi
Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/11]For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ito, Tomonori, (A170) Intell.Prop.Dept.
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10-2, Tenjin
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
02 / Yoshida, Norio, (A170) Intell.Prop.Dept.
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10-2, Tenjin
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
03 / Watanabe, Takahiro, (A170) Intell.Prop.Dept.
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10-2, Tenjin
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
 [2004/11]
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/11]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing.
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Application number, filing date03023555.028.02.2001
[2004/11]
Priority number, dateJP2000005331429.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000053314
[2004/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1396900
Date:10.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1396900
Date:14.04.2004
[2004/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2004
ClassificationIPC:H01P1/00, H05K9/00
[2004/11]
CPC:
H05K9/0022 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/11]
TitleGerman:Hochfrequenz-Bauelement und Kommunikationsgerät mit einem derartigen Bauelement[2004/11]
English:High frequency component and communication apparatus incorporating the same[2004/11]
French:Composant haute-fréquence et appareil de communication le comportant[2004/11]
Examination procedure15.10.2003Examination requested  [2004/11]
01.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2007Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/23]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01104937.6  / EP1130673
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4707722  (FOLK LEE E [US], et al) [A] 5* column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 3 *;
 [A]US5039974  (SCHAEFER HENRY A [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 14-17 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 11; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5422433  (RIVERA RUBEN [US], et al) [A] 4 * column 3, lines 10-50; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US5783978  (NOGUCHI TOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 5 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 21; figure 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.