blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1416656 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1416656



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 347
12.11.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.01.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
12.12.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.11.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.11.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
20.11.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.07.2013 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.07.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
23.07.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
23.07.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.07.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
15.07.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
15.07.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
15.07.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
15.07.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
15.07.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.07.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.07.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.07.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
01.07.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
01.07.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.06.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
06.05.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
30.04.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
29.04.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.04.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
26.04.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
26.04.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.04.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
25.04.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.04.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.04.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.04.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.04.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.04.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
16.04.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
16.04.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
16.04.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
16.04.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
16.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
16.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
16.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
16.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
16.04.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 9
14.03.2013 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Search / examination 2
07.03.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
25.02.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.02.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.02.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.02.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
18.02.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
10.02.2012 Claims Search / examination 4
10.02.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
14.11.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
14.11.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.08.2009 Description Search / examination 1
05.08.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
13.07.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.07.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.11.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.11.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 10
08.05.2008 Description Search / examination 8
08.05.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.01.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
16.01.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.05.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
23.05.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
23.05.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
19.04.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
05.04.2007 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
21.03.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.03.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.10.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.08.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
25.08.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.08.2004 European search report Search / examination 1
24.03.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
18.02.2004 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
13.02.2004 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
27.01.2004 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
27.01.2004 Priority document Search / examination 27
27.01.2004 Priority document Search / examination 37
26.01.2004 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.10.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.10.2003 Claims Search / examination 3
22.10.2003 Description Search / examination 22
22.10.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.10.2003 Drawings Search / examination 11
22.10.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6