blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1416656


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.11.2014 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
06.12.2013 (Expected) grant published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
29.11.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.11.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
05.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.07.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.07.2013 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.04.2013 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
22.04.2013 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
11.02.2013 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
05.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.02.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.11.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.11.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.11.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.11.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.08.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.07.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.11.2008 Change - representative published on  24.12.2008  [2008/52]
11.11.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.05.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.01.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.11.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.05.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.04.2007 Change - applicant published on  23.05.2007  [2007/21]
23.03.2007 First examination report
17.03.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.11.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.11.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.05.2005 Definitive list of designations published on  29.06.2005  [2005/26]
15.04.2005 Request for examination filed published on  01.06.2005  [2005/22]
20.08.2004 Publication of search report published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
19.03.2004 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.05.2004  [2004/19]