blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1416656
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008130679Global Dossier 05.06.2008A1
Priority number Date
US42307102 01.11.2002
US42307002 01.11.2002
US42329402 01.11.2002
US93388107 01.11.2007
US42316602 01.11.2002
US42303402 01.11.2002
US42307202 01.11.2002
US35547203 31.01.2003
US42307402 01.11.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7391838Global Dossier 24.06.2008B2
US2004086029 06.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
US42307102 01.11.2002
US42307002 01.11.2002
US42329402 01.11.2002
US42316602 01.11.2002
US44402303 22.05.2003
US42303402 01.11.2002
US42307202 01.11.2002
US42307402 01.11.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7324548Global Dossier 29.01.2008B2
US2004086003 06.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
US42307102 01.11.2002
US42307002 01.11.2002
US42329402 01.11.2002
US42316602 01.11.2002
US42303402 01.11.2002
US42307202 01.11.2002
US35547203 31.01.2003
US42307402 01.11.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7053720Global Dossier 30.05.2006B2
US2005128012 16.06.2005A1
Priority number Date
US4916305 02.02.2005
US44402203 22.05.2003
US42307402 01.11.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6864752Global Dossier 08.03.2005B2
US2004104781 03.06.2004A1
Priority number Date
US42307102 01.11.2002
US42307002 01.11.2002
US42329402 01.11.2002
US42616602 14.11.2002
US42303402 01.11.2002
US44402203 22.05.2003
US42307202 01.11.2002
US42307402 01.11.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
USRE45557EGlobal Dossier 09.06.2015E
Priority number Date
US4916305 02.02.2005
US44402203 22.05.2003
US42307402 01.11.2002
US201313935098 03.07.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7356076 08.04.2008B2
US2004086030 06.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
US42307102 01.11.2002
US31325802 05.12.2002
US42307002 01.11.2002
US42329402 01.11.2002
US42316602 01.11.2002
US42303402 01.11.2002
US42307202 01.11.2002
US42307402 01.11.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7391788 24.06.2008B2
US2004095952 20.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
US42316602 01.11.2002
US29917202 19.11.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7496133 24.02.2009B2
US2004105410 03.06.2004A1
Priority number Date
US42307102 01.11.2002
US42307002 01.11.2002
US42329402 01.11.2002
US42316602 01.11.2002
US42303402 01.11.2002
US42307202 01.11.2002
US29989202 19.11.2002
US42307402 01.11.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8160109 17.04.2012B2
US2004086278 06.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
US42307102 01.11.2002
US33041602 27.12.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1416656Global Dossier 08.01.2014B1
EP1416656 06.10.2004A3
EP1416656 06.05.2004A2
Priority number Date
US42307002 01.11.2002
US35547203 31.01.2003