blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1416656

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
Examination procedure20.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
02.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
02.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
European patent granted08.01.2014
Opposition procedure09.10.2014No opposition filed within time limit published on 17.12.2014 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:06.05.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:06.05.2004 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK
 
Event date:06.10.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:06.10.2004 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK
 
Event date:01.06.2005 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20050406
 
Event date:29.06.2005 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:25.04.2007 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20070321
 
Event date:23.05.2007 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:BROADCOM CORPORATION
 
Event date:21.08.2013 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20130723
 
Event date:08.01.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:08.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:20.02.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 60345567 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20140220
 
Event date:09.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 60345567 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:17.12.2014 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20141009
 
Event date:29.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 60345567 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
Effective DATE:20141009
 
Event date:24.06.2015 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20141022
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20141022
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20150630
 
Event date:31.08.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20141031
 
Event date:15.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60345567 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BOSCH JEHLE PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE
 
Event date:15.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60345567 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES GENERAL IP (SINGAPORE) PTE., SG
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BROADCOM CORP., IRVINE, CALIF., US
 
Event date:15.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60345567 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL SALES PTE. LT, SG
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BROADCOM CORP., IRVINE, CALIF., US
 
Event date:29.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60345567 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BOSCH JEHLE PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE
 
Event date:29.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60345567 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL SALES PTE. LT, SG
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES GENERAL IP (SINGAPORE) PTE. LTD., SINGAPORE, SG
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20181031
Year of Fee Payment:16