Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1416656

EP1416656 - Transceiver system and method supporting variable rates and multiple protocols [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.11.2014
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.12.2014  [2014/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Broadcom Corporation
5300 California Avenue
Irvine, CA 92617 / US
[2007/21]
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
Broadcom Corporation
16215 Alton Parkway
Irvine, California 92618-7013 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Vikram, Natarajan
31832 Via Coyote
Trabuco Canyon, CA 92679 / US
02 / Xiao, Kang
38 Santa Comba
Irvine, CA 92606 / US
03 / Caresosa, Mario
9 Saliva Street
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US
04 / Proano, Jay
10 Calle Serra
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US
05 / Chung, David
511 Promontory Drive
Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US
06 / Momtaz, Afshin
4061 Germainder Way
Irvine, California 92612 / US
07 / Stolaruk, Randy
20301 Mansard Lane
Huntingdon Beach, CA 92646 / US
08 / Wang, Xin
27 Dinuba
Irvine, California 92602 / US
09 / Kocaman, Namik
808 Timberwood
Irvine, CA 92602 / US
 [2004/19]
Representative(s)Jehle, Volker Armin , et al
Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/52]Jehle, Volker Armin , et al
Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Former [2004/19]Jehle, Volker Armin, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date03023973.522.10.2003
[2004/19]
Priority number, dateUS20020423070P01.11.2002         Original published format: US 423070 P
US2003035547231.01.2003         Original published format: US 355472
[2004/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1416656
Date:06.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1416656
Date:06.10.2004
[2004/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1416656
Date:08.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04J3/16, H04J3/04
[2004/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/26]
Former [2004/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Sende-Empfänger-Vorrichtung zur Unterstützung veränderlicher Bitraten und mehrerer Protokolle[2004/19]
English:Transceiver system and method supporting variable rates and multiple protocols[2004/19]
French:Méthode et dispostif de transmission-réception afin de supporter des débits variables et plusieurs protocols[2004/19]
Examination procedure06.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/22]
21.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2013Date of oral proceedings
15.07.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
23.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2013Fee for grant paid
20.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.03.2007
Opposition(s)09.10.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
02.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
02.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]US2001014104  (ARMSTRONG TIMOTHY J ET AL) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0008] , [0009] , [0033] - [0035] *;
 [A]US2002159473  (ROBERTS KIM B ET AL) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
by applicantUS2001014104
 US5959749