blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1424369

EP1424369 - Laminate comprising interference pigments, method for its manufacture and use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2012
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2012Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.04.2012  [2012/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Benecke-Kaliko Aktiengesellschaft
Beneckeallee 40
D-30419 Hannover / DE
[2004/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Bühring, Jürgen, Dr.
Kleiststrasse 56
73033 Göppingen / DE
02 / Hülsewede, Volker, Dr.
Eislingerstrasse 46
73037 Göppingen / DE
03 / Koch, Heino
Göttingerstrasse 22
31061 Alfeld / DE
04 / Mäker, Michael
Gerberstrasse 16
30169 Hannover / DE
 [2004/23]
Representative(s)Finger, Karsten, et al
Continental Aktiengesellschaft
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/17]Finger, Karsten, et al
Continental Aktiengesellschaft, Vahrenwalder Str. 9
30165 Hannover / DE
Former [2004/23]Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 03 29
81630 München / DE
Application number, filing date03025334.804.11.2003
[2004/23]
Priority number, dateDE200215368018.11.2002         Original published format: DE 10253680
[2004/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1424369
Date:02.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2004
ClassificationIPC:C09B67/00, C09D5/36, C09K19/00, B32B27/20
[2004/23]
CPC:
B32B27/08 (EP,US); B32B27/20 (EP,US); B32B27/304 (US);
B32B27/306 (US); B32B27/40 (US); C09K19/52 (EP);
B32B2307/3065 (US); B32B2307/4026 (US); B32B2307/412 (US);
B32B2327/06 (US); B32B2375/00 (US); B32B2605/00 (US);
B32B2605/003 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/23]
TitleGerman:Verbundgebilde mit einem Gehalt an Effekt-Pigmenten, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und dessen Verwendung[2004/23]
English:Laminate comprising interference pigments, method for its manufacture and use[2004/23]
French:Stratifié comprenant des pigments à effet, sa préparation et son utilisation[2004/23]
Examination procedure11.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/02]
25.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2012Application withdrawn by applicant  [2012/17]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.07.2005
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5362315  (MUELLER-REES CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [DA] 1,6,15,16,18 * column 2, line 51; examples 7,11; claims 1,8-10 *;
 [AY]US5834064  (DIETZ ERWIN [DE], et al) [A] 1,6,7,18 * column 1, lines 10-13,59-60 - column 2, lines 3-5,18-25; claims 1,3-6,12,13,15,16 * * column 7, lines 36-52 - column 8, lines 33-52-67 * * column 9, lines 8-11,19; example 6 * [Y] 1,6,7,14,18;
 [DA]US5851604  (MUELLER-REES CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [DA] * example 19 *;
 [AY]US5942030  (SCHUHMACHER PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1,6,18,19 * column 2, lines 39-50; claims 1,9-11,16,17 * [Y] 1,6,7,14,18;
 [A]EP1078974  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,6,10,11,18* paragraphs [13 20] - [22 34 36 68] - [76 83 97]; claims 1,8,9,12,13,22,24 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.