Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1418353

EP1418353 - Low-friction sliding mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.08.2008
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, TR
published on 21.10.2009  [2009/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED
2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
For all designated states
Nippon Oil Corporation
3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8412 / JP
[2007/43]
Former [2004/20]For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED
2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
For all designated states
Nippon Oil Corporation
3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8412 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Konishi, Shozaburo
Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP
02 / Kano, Makoto
3-405, 4-2-1, Ryokuen Izumi-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 245-0002 / JP
03 / Yasuda, Yoshiteru
365-2-2-303, Shiba-cho Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0012 / JP
04 / Mabuchi, Yutaka
37-28-305, Ikebukuro Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0834 / JP
05 / Hamada, Takahiro
3-3-1-A203, Tsurumichuo Tsurumi-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0051 / JP
06 / Takeshima, Shigeki
Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP
07 / Tsushima, Kenji
Ikoinomachi B401 4-4-21, Nokendai Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0057 / JP
 [2004/20]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/20]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03025444.505.11.2003
[2004/20]
Priority number, dateJP2002032232206.11.2002         Original published format: JP 2002322322
JP2003020705611.08.2003         Original published format: JP 2003207056
JP2003020819321.08.2003         Original published format: JP 2003208193
[2004/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1418353
Date:12.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1418353
Date:29.06.2005
[2005/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1418353
Date:24.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:F16C33/12
[2004/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/20]
TitleGerman:Gleitmechanismus mit geringer Reibung[2004/20]
English:Low-friction sliding mechanism[2004/20]
French:Dispositif de glissement à faible frottement[2004/20]
Examination procedure05.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/20]
22.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2007Fee for grant paid
05.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.10.2007
CY24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
EE24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
RO24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
SK24.10.2007
TR24.10.2007
IE05.11.2007
LU05.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
BG24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
HU25.04.2008
[2009/43]
Former [2009/38]AT24.10.2007
CY24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
EE24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
RO24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
SK24.10.2007
IE05.11.2007
LU05.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
BG24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2009/34]AT24.10.2007
CY24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
EE24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
RO24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
SK24.10.2007
IE05.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
BG24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2009/10]AT24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
EE24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
RO24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
SK24.10.2007
IE05.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
BG24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2008/48]AT24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
RO24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
SK24.10.2007
IE05.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
BG24.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2008/39]AT24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
RO24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
SK24.10.2007
MC30.11.2007
BG24.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2008/35]AT24.10.2007
CZ24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
MC30.11.2007
BG24.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2008/29]AT24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
MC30.11.2007
BG24.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2008/26]NL24.10.2007
SI24.10.2007
BG24.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2008/24]NL24.10.2007
BG24.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5482602  (COOPER CLARK V [US], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0025]; figure 1; claims 1-10 * [A] 6-9;
 [YA]DE10061397  (DESCH ANTRIEBSTECHNIK GMBH & C [DE]) [Y] 1,6 * the whole document * [A] 10-14;
 [YA]WO9321288  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1,6 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-5; claims 1-27 * [A] 2,5,7-9;
 [A]EP1067211  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,6-10 * column 1, line 17 - column 19, line 12; figures 1,5-7; claim 15 *