blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1386629

EP1386629 - Method for conditioning gas [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2011
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.08.2011  [2011/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lexion Medical, LLC
5000 Township Parkway
St. Paul, MN 55101 / US
[2010/50]
Former [2004/06]For all designated states
Lexion Medical, LLC
1957 Gateway Boulevard
St. Paul, MN 55112-2750 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ott, Douglas E.
682 Foster Road
Macon GA 31210 / US
02 / sCHAEFER, John, F.
118 Dumbarton Drive
Macon GA 31210 / US
03 / Gray, Robert, I.
1483 Olgethorpe Street
Macon GA 31201 / US
 [2004/14]
Representative(s)Schäfer, Horst, et al
Schweiger & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Karlstrasse 35
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/19]Schäfer, Horst, Dr., et al
Schweiger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karl-Theodor-Strasse 69
80803 München / DE
Former [2004/06]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03025749.711.04.1995
[2004/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1386629
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1386629
Date:25.02.2004
[2004/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1386629
Date:25.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2004
ClassificationIPC:A61M13/00, A61M16/10
[2004/06]
CPC:
A61M13/003 (EP); A61M16/1095 (EP); A61M16/1075 (EP);
A61M2205/3372 (EP); A61M2205/7518 (EP); A61M2205/7536 (EP);
A61M2205/7545 (EP); A61M2205/8206 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2004/06]
TitleGerman:Methode zur Konditionierung von Gas[2004/06]
English:Method for conditioning gas[2004/06]
French:Procédé de conditionement de gaz[2004/06]
Examination procedure10.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/06]
29.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.10.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
19.10.2005Date of oral proceedings
14.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
23.02.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
01.03.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2010Fee for grant paid
02.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination05.12.2005Appeal received No.  T0238/06
03.02.2006Statement of grounds filed
26.06.2006Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95916308.0  / EP0827417
Divisional application(s)EP10173877.1  / EP2248546
Opposition(s)26.05.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
10.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
10.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
10.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
30.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
22.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 12
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 13
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 14
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 15
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 16
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search
ExaminationUS4121583
 US4825863
 US5006109
 WO9119527
 US5246419
 US5383447
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.