blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1426454

EP1426454 - Method for producing a formed component with at least two regions of structure having different ductility and continuous furnace therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.09.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.11.2004  [2004/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH
Abteilung 3235, An der Talle 27-31
33102 Paderborn / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH
Abteilung 3235, An der Talle 27-31
33102 Paderborn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Krogmeier, Jürgen
Lerchenstrasse 20
33161 Hövelhof / DE
02 / Reinhold, Patrick, Dr.
Platanenallee 57
59425 Unna / DE
03 / Böke, Johannes, Dr.
Kleistring 35
32825 Blomberg / DE
 [2004/24]
Application number, filing date03026402.219.11.2003
[2004/24]
Priority number, dateDE200215662103.12.2002         Original published format: DE 10256621
[2004/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1426454
Date:09.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2004
ClassificationIPC:C21D9/00, C21D9/46, F27B9/02
[2004/24]
CPC:
C21D9/0056 (EP,US); C21D9/0006 (EP,US); C21D9/0068 (EP,US);
C21D9/46 (EP,US); F27B9/021 (EP,US); F27B9/045 (EP,US);
F27B9/20 (EP,US); F27B9/2469 (EP,US); F27B9/30 (EP,US);
F27B9/36 (EP,US); C21D2221/00 (EP,US); C21D2221/02 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Formbauteils mit mindestens zwei Gefügebereichen unterschiedlicher Duktilität und Durchlaufofen hierfür[2004/24]
English:Method for producing a formed component with at least two regions of structure having different ductility and continuous furnace therefor[2004/24]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une piéce de forme avec au moins deux régions de structure de ductilité differente et four continu associé[2004/24]
Examination procedure17.09.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/46]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5238510  (DUTTON RONALD J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * column 2, line 9 - line 25 * * column 3, line 7 - line 40 *;
 [PX]DE10208216  (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1* claim 1 *;
 [PX]EP1327692  (SALZGITTER FLACHSTAHL GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4,5,7 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.