Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1441222

EP1441222 - Apparatus for and method of acoustically monitoring a gas supply [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.07.2011
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.08.2011  [2011/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maquet Critical Care AB
Röntgenvägen 2
171 95 Solna / SE
[2004/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Wallen, Lars
Järneksvägen 16
16347 Spänga / SE
 [2004/31]
Representative(s)Stein, Jan , et al
Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/33]Stein, Jan Anders Lennart , et al
Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date03027519.229.11.2003
[2004/31]
Priority number, dateSE2003000016023.01.2003         Original published format: SE 0300160
[2004/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1441222
Date:28.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1441222
Date:21.07.2010
[2010/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:G01N29/02, G01F1/66, A61B5/083, A61M16/10
[2010/29]
Former International [2004/31]G01N29/02, G01F1/66
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2011/13]
Former [2004/31]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur akustischen Überwachung einer Gasversorgung[2004/31]
English:Apparatus for and method of acoustically monitoring a gas supply[2004/31]
French:Dispositif et procédé pour le surveillement acoustique d'une alimentation en gaz[2004/31]
Examination procedure22.01.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/35]
11.03.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2011/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201008   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1205748  (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0023] *;
 [Y]US4616501  (MECHLENBURG DOUGLAS M [US]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 40 - column 6, line 42 *;
 [Y]EP0723147  (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 4, line 23 - page 19, line 30 *;
 [A]WO0050890  (METASENSORS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *