Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1426531

EP1426531 - Combined drive unit for a window lifter and a door lock in a vehicle door [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/24]Combined drive unit for a window lifter and a door lock in a vehicle door.
[2008/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.04.2011  [2011/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kiekert Aktiengesellschaft
Kettwiger Strasse 12-24
42579 Heiligenhaus / DE
[2004/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Nass, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing.
Mellinghofer Strasse 365 D
45475 Mülheim / DE
 [2004/24]
Application number, filing date03027560.601.12.2003
[2004/24]
Priority number, dateDE2002218679U03.12.2002         Original published format: DE 20218679 U
[2004/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1426531
Date:09.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1426531
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:E05B65/12, E05F15/16, B60J5/04
[2004/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2005/09]
Former [2004/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kombinierte Antriebseinheit für eine Fensterhebeeinrichtung und ein Türschloss in einer Kraftfahrzeugtür[2004/24]
English:Combined drive unit for a window lifter and a door lock in a vehicle door[2008/42]
French:Unité motrice combinée pour un lève-vitre et un verrou dans une porte de véhicule[2008/42]
Former [2004/24]Combined drive unit for a window lifter and a door lock in a vehicle door.
Former [2004/24]Unité motrice combinée pour un lève-vitre et un verrou dans une porte de véhicule.
Examination procedure06.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/05]
10.12.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.04.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
15.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2008Fee for grant paid
19.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.01.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005BG   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005CZ   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005EE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005GB   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005HU   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005RO   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005SI   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005SK   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT25.02.2009
ES05.06.2009
[2011/14]
Former [2009/46]ES05.06.2009
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE19755942  (DRAEXLMAIER LISA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-3 * abstract * * claims 3,6 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]DE10047946  (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE CORP LP [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * claims 3,4,7 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [AD]EP1149969  (MERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYS LTD [GB]) [AD] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0016] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE19526451  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4381625  (ANDREI-ALEXANDRU MARCEL [DE], et al) [A] 1,3 * column A * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *