blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1427121

EP1427121 - Radio access network, radio communication method, synchronous server and node [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.06.2009
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT DoCoMo, Inc.
11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]For all designated states
NTT DoCoMo, Inc.
11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
NTT DoCoMo, Inc.
11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Koshino, Masayuki, Int.Prop.Dpt., NTT DoCoMo, Inc.
Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Yamada, Mayu, Int.Prop.Dpt., NTT DoCoMo, Inc.
Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Nakamura, Takehiro, Int.Prop.Dpt., NTT DoCoMo, Inc
Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2004/24]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/24]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date03027719.802.12.2003
[2004/24]
Priority number, dateJP2002034988802.12.2002         Original published format: JP 2002349888
[2004/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1427121
Date:09.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1427121
Date:20.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2004
ClassificationIPC:H04J3/06
[2004/24]
CPC:
H04J3/0658 (EP,US); H04J3/0664 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2005/09]
Former [2004/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Funkzugangsnetzwerk, Funkkommunikationsverfahren, synchroner Server und Netzwerkknoten[2004/24]
English:Radio access network, radio communication method, synchronous server and node[2004/24]
French:Réseau d'accès radio, méthode de communication radio, serveur synchrone et noeud[2004/24]
Examination procedure02.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/24]
18.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2008Fee for grant paid
13.06.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0042728  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 3 * * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 25 * * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 2 * * page 11, lines 12-19 * * page 12, lines 7-13 * * page 13, line 26 - page 14, line 19 * * page 15, line 1 - page 16, line 18 * * page 20, lines 23-31 * * page 24, line 20 - page 25, line 31 * * page 27, line 23 - page 28, line 2 * * page 29, lines 1-6 * * claim - *;
 [XY]WO0143325  (BROADCOM HOMENETWORKING INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * abstract * * page 1, line 21 - page 3, line 21 * * page 10, line 16 - page 11, line 20 * * claim - * [Y] 6;
 [Y]  - MILLS D L, "INTERNET TIME SYNCHRONIZATION: THE NETWORK TIME PROTOCOL", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19911001), vol. 39, no. 10, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 1482 - 1493, XP000275311 [Y] 6 * page 1488, column R, lines 31-42 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.103043
 [A]  - FASBENDER A ET AL, "ON ASSESSING UNIDIRECTIONAL LATENCIES IN PACKET-SWITCHED NETWORKS", 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS. MONTREAL, JUNE 8 - 12, 1997, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC), NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (19980608), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-3926-6, pages 490 - 494, XP002124761 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.