blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1431199

EP1431199 - Plastic barrel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 07.11.2007  [2007/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schütz GmbH & Co. KGaA
56242 Selters / DE
[2004/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Schütz, Udo
Schützstrasse 12
56242 Selters / DE
 [2004/26]
Representative(s)Pürckhauer, Rolf
Am Rosenwald 25
57234 Wilnsdorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]Pürckhauer, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Am Rosenwald 25
57234 Wilnsdorf / DE
Application number, filing date03027907.904.12.2003
[2004/26]
Priority number, dateDE200215912618.12.2002         Original published format: DE 10259126
[2004/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1431199
Date:23.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1431199
Date:08.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2004
ClassificationIPC:B65D21/02, B65D1/16, B65D43/02
[2004/26]
CPC:
B65D21/0233 (EP,US); B65D1/16 (EP,US); B65D43/0229 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00092 (EP,US); B65D2543/00351 (EP,US); B65D2543/00407 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2005/11]
Former [2004/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kunststofftonne[2004/26]
English:Plastic barrel[2004/26]
French:Tonneau en matériau plastique[2004/26]
Examination procedure26.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/44]
31.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2005Fee for grant paid
26.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/40]IT08.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]DE381407  (PHILIPP KALT) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2661862  (HOWE HERBERT B) [Y] 4 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4082184  (HAMMER GREGORY) [X] 1,2,8 * column 3, line 39 - line 51; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4930648  (HUNDT GARY W [US]) [A] 1,3* figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US5072850  (GAGNON ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 *;
 [YA]US5232120  (DUNKEN SIDNEY H [US], et al) [Y] 3 * figures 1,2,14A,15,17 * [A] 1,2,4-8;
 [XAY]WO9525054  (STERIFANT INTERNATIONAL HOLDIN [LU], et al) [X] 1,5-8 * page 9, paragraph 9 - page 11, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 * [A] 2 [Y] 3,4
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.