blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1428608

EP1428608 - Method of controlling the pressing force of a tool of a joining device and such joining device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2007
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIMAK Automatisierte Schweisstechnik GmbH
Werkstrasse
57537 Wissen / DE
[2006/14]
Former [2004/25]For all designated states
NIMAK Automatisierte Schweisstechnik GmbH
Werkstrasse
57537 Wissen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Nickel, Paul Gerhard
Am Steimel 20
57537 Wissen / DE
 [2004/25]
Representative(s)Zapf, Christoph, et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Solf und Zapf
Hauptstrasse 97
51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/13]Zapf, Christoph, et al
Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- u. Rechtsanwälte Hauptstrasse 97
51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2004/25]Zapf, Christoph, Dipl.-Ing.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf, Theodor-Heuss-Ring 1-3
D-50668 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date03027937.604.12.2003
[2004/25]
Priority number, dateDE200215805911.12.2002         Original published format: DE 10258059
[2004/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1428608
Date:16.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1428608
Date:05.04.2006
Language:DE
[2006/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.2004
ClassificationIPC:B23K11/25, B21D39/03
[2004/25]
CPC:
B23K11/31 (EP); B23K11/311 (EP); B23K11/315 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/25]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Steuern einer Werkzeug-Anpresskraft bei Fügevorrichtungen und entsprechende Fügevorrichtung[2004/25]
English:Method of controlling the pressing force of a tool of a joining device and such joining device[2004/25]
French:Procédé de contrôle de la force de pression d'un outil d'assemblage et dispositif d'assemblage correspondant[2004/25]
Examination procedure26.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/35]
19.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2005Fee for grant paid
30.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY05.04.2006
CZ05.04.2006
EE05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
RO05.04.2006
SI05.04.2006
SK05.04.2006
TR05.04.2006
BG05.07.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
GR06.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
HU06.10.2006
LU04.12.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]CZ05.04.2006
EE05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
RO05.04.2006
SI05.04.2006
SK05.04.2006
TR05.04.2006
BG05.07.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
GR06.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
HU06.10.2006
LU04.12.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/32]CZ05.04.2006
EE05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
RO05.04.2006
SI05.04.2006
SK05.04.2006
BG05.07.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
GR06.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
HU06.10.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/31]CZ05.04.2006
EE05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
RO05.04.2006
SI05.04.2006
SK05.04.2006
BG05.07.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
GR06.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/28]CZ05.04.2006
EE05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
RO05.04.2006
SI05.04.2006
SK05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
GR06.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/21]CZ05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
RO05.04.2006
SI05.04.2006
SK05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
GR06.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/49]CZ05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
RO05.04.2006
SI05.04.2006
SK05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/45]CZ05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
RO05.04.2006
SI05.04.2006
SK05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/41]CZ05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
IT05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
RO05.04.2006
SI05.04.2006
SK05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/40]CZ05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
IT05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
SI05.04.2006
SK05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/27]CZ05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
GB05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
SI05.04.2006
SK05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2007/19]CZ05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
SI05.04.2006
SK05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2007/13]CZ05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
IE05.04.2006
SI05.04.2006
SK05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2006/52]FI05.04.2006
SI05.04.2006
SE05.07.2006
Former [2006/48]SI05.04.2006
SE05.07.2006
Former [2006/40]SI05.04.2006
Documents cited:Search[XA]FR2585976  (ARO [FR]) [X] 5 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,6,7;
 [A]EP0566741  (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7* page 4, lines 2-28 *;
 [XA]US6064028  (SCHMID-DOERNTE JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 5 * abstract * [A] 1-4,6,7
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.