blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1428673

EP1428673 - Phase change ink imaging component with nano-size filler [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.10.2009
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.11.2009  [2009/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Patent Department
Xerox Square - 20 A
100 Clinton Avenue South
Rochester, NY 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/49]For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Former [2004/25]For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Pan, David H.
10 Westfield Commons
Rochester, NY 14625 / US
02 / Badesha, Santokh S.
165 Van Voorhis Road
Pittsford, NY 14534 / US
 [2004/25]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/25]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03028171.108.12.2003
[2004/25]
Priority number, dateUS2002031623409.12.2002         Original published format: US 316234
[2004/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1428673
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1428673
Date:03.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2004
ClassificationIPC:B41M5/00, B41J2/005
[2004/25]
CPC:
C09D11/34 (EP,US); B41J2/0057 (EP,US); B41N10/02 (EP,US);
C09D11/101 (EP,US); B41N2210/02 (EP,US); B41N2210/10 (EP,US);
B41N2210/14 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/10]
Former [2004/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Phasenaustauschtinte für Bilderstellungskomponente mit Nanogrössenfüller[2004/25]
English:Phase change ink imaging component with nano-size filler[2004/25]
French:Encre à changement de phase pour composant de formation d'image avec charge de dimension nano[2004/25]
Examination procedure16.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/06]
05.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
12.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2008Fee for grant paid
16.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4372246  (AZAR JACK C, et al) [A] 1-10* column 4, line 26 - column 6, line 15; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US5021802  (ALLRED DONALD R [US]) [Y] 6-8 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 2 *;
 [XY]US5389958  (BUI LOC V [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 62 * [Y] 4-9;
 [A]US6336963  (MALHOTRA SHADI L [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 9, line 6 - column 20, line 55 *;
 [Y]EP1205821  (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 4,5,9 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0061] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.