blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1432141

EP1432141 - Transmission power control system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.09.2009
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hosokawa, Taisuke
c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2004/26]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Former [2004/26]Glawe. Delfs. Moll
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date03028686.816.12.2003
[2004/26]
Priority number, dateJP2002036457717.12.2002         Original published format: JP 2002364577
[2004/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1432141
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1432141
Date:19.04.2006
[2006/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2006
ClassificationIPC:H04B7/005
[2004/26]
CPC:
H04W52/367 (EP,US); H04W52/12 (EP,US); H04W52/24 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/52]
Former [2004/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sendeleistungsregelungssystem[2004/26]
English:Transmission power control system[2004/26]
French:Système de commande de puissance d'émission[2004/26]
Examination procedure12.04.2006Examination requested  [2006/23]
05.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.09.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0065748  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 7, line 12 - line 19 * * page 8, line 1 - line 22 * * page 11, line 1 - line 8 * * figures 3-5 *;
 [X]EP1067706  (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-8 * abstract ** paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0036] - [0038] - [0042] *;
 [X]EP1248388  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0038] , [0041] * * figures 11,12 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.