Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1434288 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1434288



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 636
18.11.2016 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
11.11.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.07.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
08.07.2016 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
08.07.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
08.07.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.07.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.02.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.02.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.02.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.02.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.10.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.10.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.10.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.10.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.10.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2015 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
24.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 7
19.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.06.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
17.06.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.06.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.06.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.06.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2014 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
07.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2014 Description Opposition 7
31.07.2014 Description Opposition 5
31.07.2014 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.03.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
21.03.2014 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
21.03.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
13.08.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.08.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.08.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.08.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.08.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 19
11.07.2013 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
10.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.06.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.05.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.03.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
13.03.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
30.01.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
22.01.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
21.11.2012 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Appeal 1
03.05.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
16.04.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.04.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
03.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.11.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 2
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
14.03.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.03.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
03.03.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
03.03.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
03.03.2011 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
15.02.2011 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 2
08.02.2011 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
29.11.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
29.10.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.10.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
21.10.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
22.09.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.09.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.09.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
26.08.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
20.08.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.06.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.06.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.06.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.06.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.06.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
11.06.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
11.06.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 4
11.06.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.03.2010 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.01.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
15.01.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
30.11.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.11.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.11.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.11.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.11.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
25.11.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.11.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
25.11.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
27.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2008 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
07.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2008 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
06.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
21.07.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
28.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.05.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.05.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.01.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
11.01.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.12.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.11.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
28.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.11.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 24
28.11.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
28.11.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.11.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
01.02.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.10.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
31.10.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
31.10.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
10.10.2006 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
10.10.2006 Translation of priority document Search / examination 28
17.07.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.07.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.07.2006 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
17.07.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
30.06.2006 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.01.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
05.01.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
05.01.2006 Description Search / examination 20
05.01.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
15.11.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.11.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.06.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
29.06.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.06.2005 General enquiry Search / examination 1
19.07.2004 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
19.07.2004 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 3
12.07.2004 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
19.05.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
29.04.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
29.04.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.04.2004 European search report Search / examination 1
26.03.2004 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
12.03.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
27.02.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.02.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.02.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.02.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.02.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.02.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2004 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.01.2004 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2004 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
21.01.2004 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
18.12.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.12.2003 Claims Search / examination 3
18.12.2003 Description Search / examination 30
18.12.2003 Drawings Search / examination 1
18.12.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6