Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1421979 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1421979



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 280
17.06.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
03.03.2008 Closing of application Search / examination 2
14.12.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.12.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 27
26.10.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
13.08.2007 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
25.06.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 14
14.06.2007 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
18.05.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.05.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 13
10.05.2007 Claims Appeal 2
10.05.2007 Claims Appeal 2
10.05.2007 Claims Appeal 2
10.05.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
10.05.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
09.05.2007 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.05.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.03.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
02.03.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
15.02.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
26.01.2007 Claims Appeal 2
26.01.2007 Claims Appeal 2
26.01.2007 Claims Appeal 2
26.01.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
26.01.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
08.12.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.10.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.10.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.09.2006 Decision to refuse according to the state of the file Search / examination 2
28.09.2006 Means of redress Search / examination 1
27.09.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.09.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.09.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 8
02.08.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.12.2005 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.12.2005 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.12.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
22.12.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.12.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.05.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
09.05.2005 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 7
07.01.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
05.11.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
05.11.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.06.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
01.06.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.04.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
07.04.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
07.04.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.04.2004 European search report Search / examination 1
07.04.2004 Supplemental sheet C (search incomplete) Search / examination 1
19.12.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.12.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
19.12.2003 Description Search / examination 25
19.12.2003 Drawings Search / examination 16
19.12.2003 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 6
08.02.1999 Priority document Search / examination 50