EP1443403 - Method and system for an atomically updated, central cache memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, David C. 17525 NE 40th Street Apartment E-322 Redmond Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
Leonov, Mikhail V. 9205 122nd Ct NE No. A-111 Kirkland Washington 98033 / US | 03 /
Byrd, Michael M. PMB 329 14150 NE 20 Bellevue Washington 98007 / US | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03029473.0 | 19.12.2003 | [2004/32] | Priority number, date | US20030352599 | 28.01.2003 Original published format: US 352599 | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1443403 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1443403 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08, G06F17/30 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
G09G5/363 (EP,US);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G06F9/52 (EP,US);
G09G5/393 (EP,US);
G09G2360/121 (EP,US);
G09G2370/027 (EP,US);
G09G5/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/32] | Title | German: | Verfahen und system für einen atomar aktualisierten zentralen Cache-Speicher | [2004/32] | English: | Method and system for an atomically updated, central cache memory | [2004/32] | French: | Méthode et système pour mise-à-jour atomique d' anté-mémoire centrale | [2004/32] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 18.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/47] | 05.07.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP08015408.1 / EP1993039 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5526511 (SWENSON ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9-13,20-23,25-29,33,36,46 * figures 1,3,4,7,8 * * column 4, line 7 - column 17, line 4 *; | [X]US5706462 (MATOUSEK JON FRANKLIN [US]) [X] 1-10,14,15,20-27,35,36,46 * abstract * * column 1, lines 27-64 * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 63 * * column 6, lines 1-21 * * column 11, lines 1-29 * * column 13, lines 5-21 * * column 14, lines 1-35 * * column 15, lines 1-10,34-41,46-57 * * column 15, line 60 - column 16, line 5 * * column 17, line 4 - column 18, line 48 * * column 19, lines 59-67 * * column 21, lines 35-39 * * column 22, lines 25-28 *; | [X]US5883640 (HSIEH PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,20-27,30-33,36,46 * figures 1,4,5 * * column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 24 * * column 4, lines 4-22 * * column 6, lines 3-55 * * column 7, lines 29-35 * * column 8, line 47 - column 15, line 15 *; | [X]EP1113413 (GE MED SYS GLOBAL TECH CO LLC [US]) [X] 1-7,9-14,20-27,30-33,35,36,46 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0006] , [0009] - [0019] *; | [X]US6360023 (BETRISEY CLAUDE [US], et al) [X] 1-4,20-24,36,46 * abstract * * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 40 * * column 8, lines 30-57 * * column 11, line 4 - column 14, line 34 ** column 17, line 29 - column 18, line 14 * | Examination | - WU M ET AL, "ENVY: A NON-VOLATILE, MAIN MEMORY STORAGE SYSTEM", ACM SIGPLAN NOTICES, ACM, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19941101), vol. 29, no. 11, doi:10.1145/195470.195506, ISSN 0362-1340, pages 86 - 97, XP000491727 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/195470.195506 |