blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1434446

EP1434446 - Carrier identification codes conversion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2007
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Communications, Inc.
900 Broken Sound Parkway
Boca Raton, Florida 33487-3587 / US
[2005/46]
Former [2004/27]For all designated states
Siemens Information and Communication Networks Inc.
900 Broken Sound Parkway
Boca Raton, FL 33487-3587 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Vandermeiden, David A.
300 E. Conference Drive
Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US
02 / Stumer, Peggy M.
2350 North West 30th Road
Boca Raton, FL 33431 / US
 [2004/27]
Representative(s)Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/02]Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al
Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2007/10]Berg, Peter, et al
Siemens AG CT IP L&T Corporate Intellectual Property and Functions Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2005/46]Neill, Andrew Peter, et al
Siemens Shared Services, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2004/27]Allen, Derek, et al
Siemens Group Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
Application number, filing date03029642.022.12.2003
[2004/27]
Priority number, dateUS2002032829123.12.2002         Original published format: US 328291
[2004/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1434446
Date:30.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1434446
Date:18.05.2005
[2005/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1434446
Date:21.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2005
ClassificationIPC:H04Q3/00
[2004/27]
CPC:
H04M3/4228 (EP,US); H04Q3/0045 (EP,US); H04M3/42289 (EP,US);
H04M7/1245 (EP,US); H04Q2213/13097 (EP,US); H04Q2213/13102 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13103 (EP,US); H04Q2213/13141 (EP,US); H04Q2213/13196 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13384 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2006/06]
Former [2004/27]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Umsetzung von Trägeridentifikationskodes[2004/27]
English:Carrier identification codes conversion[2004/27]
French:Conversion de codes d'identification de porteuses[2004/27]
Examination procedure15.09.2005Examination requested  [2005/46]
22.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2006Fee for grant paid
08.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5550909  (CHANDA RAJAT [US], et al) [X] 1,2,13,15 * column A * * column 1, line 46 - line 64 * * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 19 - line 57 *;
 [A]US2001040957  (MCCANN THOMAS MATTHEW [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column A * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0076] *;
 [A]  - ATOUI M ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Virtual private network call processing in the intelligent network", DISCOVERING A NEW WORLD OF COMMUNICATIONS. CHICAGO, JUNE 14 - 18, 1992. BOUND TOGETHER WITH B0190700, VOL. 3, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19920614), VOL. 4, ISBN 0-7803-0599-X, pages 561 - 565, XP010062114 [A] 1-21 * page 561, column L, line 35 - line 43 * * page 562, column L, line 18 - column R, line 8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1992.268219
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.