Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1455197

EP1455197 - Calibration method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.11.2015
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP
[2007/37]
Former [2004/37]For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kamitani, Gaku
Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd.
26-10,Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
 [2015/01]
Former [2004/37]01 / Kamitani, Gaku
Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/50]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann
Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2004/37]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing.
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Application number, filing date03029772.523.12.2003
[2004/37]
Priority number, dateJP2003005903405.03.2003         Original published format: JP 2003059034
JP2003013238809.05.2003         Original published format: JP 2003132388
JP2003034725106.10.2003         Original published format: JP 2003347251
[2004/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1455197
Date:08.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1455197
Date:08.12.2004
[2004/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1455197
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:G01R35/00, G01R27/28
[2004/50]
Former International [2004/37]G01R35/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/37]
TitleGerman:Gerät und Verfahren zum Kalibrieren[2004/37]
English:Calibration method and apparatus[2004/37]
French:Méthode et appareil pour calibrer[2004/37]
Examination procedure23.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/37]
04.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2014Fee for grant paid
19.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.12.2006
Opposition(s)01.10.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
26.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
27.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
02.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
04.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.12.2003
AT31.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
BG31.12.2014
CY31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
IT31.12.2014
MC31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
TR31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2016/33]AT31.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
IT31.12.2014
MC31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2016/24]AT31.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
IT31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2016/12]AT31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
IT31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SI31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2016/03]AT31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
IT31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/49]AT31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
DK31.12.2014
EE31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/38]AT31.12.2014
CZ31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/37]CZ31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
SK31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/36]CZ31.12.2014
ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
RO31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/33]ES31.12.2014
FI31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/29]FI31.12.2014
NL31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/24]FI31.12.2014
SE31.12.2014
GR01.04.2015
Former [2015/23]FI31.12.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US6492797  (MAASSEN HOWARD M [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0566823  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *