Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1452484

EP1452484 - Hydrogen peroxide solution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.05.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Van Geetruy, Philip
Ledebaan 86
9300 Aalst / BE
For all designated states
Quackels, Gino
Dendermondsesteenweg 23, b4
9300 Aalst / BE
[2012/15]
Former [2005/24]For all designated states
Van Geetruy, Philip
Ledebaan 86
9300 Aalst / BE
For all designated states
Quackels, Gino
Noenstraat 40A
9300 Aalst / BE
Former [2004/36]For all designated states
Projectadvies Waalhof B.V.
Pastoriestraat 137
5612 EK Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Bouman, Frans
Kwikstaartweg 27
3136 JH Vlaardingen / NL
 [2004/36]
Representative(s)Brants, Johan P.E. , et al
Brantsandpatents bvba
Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24
9051 Ghent / BE
[N/P]
Former [2011/51]Brants, Johan P.E. , et al
Brantsandpatents bvba Guldensporenpark 75
9820 Merelbeke / BE
Former [2005/24]Brants, Johan Philippe Emile , et al
De Clercq, Brants & Partners cv Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
Former [2004/50]Jilderda, Anne Ayolt , et al
Octrooibureau LIOC B.V., Postbus 13363
3507 LJ Utrecht / NL
Former [2004/36]Visser-Luirink, Gesina, Dr.
Octrooibureau Lioc, P.O. Box 13363
3507 LJ Utrecht / NL
Application number, filing date03075514.421.02.2003
[2004/36]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1452484
Date:01.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:C01B15/037, C05F3/00, C05G3/02, A61L2/18, C02F1/72, C02F11/14
[2004/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/36]
Extension statesAL01.03.2005
LT01.03.2005
LV01.03.2005
MK01.03.2005
RO01.03.2005
TitleGerman:Wasserstoffperoxidlösung[2004/36]
English:Hydrogen peroxide solution[2004/36]
French:Solution de peroxyde d'hydrogène[2004/36]
Examination procedure01.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/17]
12.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.11.2015
11.11.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.12.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.12.2016
19.12.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
04.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination22.02.2017Appeal received No.  T1375/17
03.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.05.2005
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
30.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
12.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
27.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
21.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 17
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201008   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2010
29.02.201210   M06   Fee paid on   12.03.2012
28.02.201412   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH06121619  ;
 AU546214B  [ ] (AUSTRALIA, METROPOLITAN WATER SEWERAGE AND DRAINAGE BOARD);
 [X]JPS56169859  ;
 [X]EP0855188  (WAVERLEY PHARMA LTD) [X] 1-10,16,22 * the whole document *;
 [X]GB1041586  (LAPORTE CHEMICAL) [X] 1-13,22 * the whole document *;
 [XD]EP1043273  (AQUA CONSULT & DESIGN B V) [XD] 1,2,5-8,11-22 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 57 * * column 2, lines 19-28 *;
 [X]US5658595  (VAN OS JAN) [X] 1,2,5-10,15,16,22 * column 2, lines 3-15 * * column 2, lines 48-59 * * column 3, lines 16-30 *;
 [X]DE318135  (META SARASON) [X] 1 * the whole document *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 23, Database accession no. 1994-185877, XP002255659 & JPH06121619 A 19940506 (GOLD KOSAN KK) [X] 1-13,20,22 * abstract *
 [X]  - BRUNTON, JOHN FREDERICK ET AL, "Cleaning of copper articles", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19860714), vol. 105, no. 2, Database accession no. 10545, XP002123573 [X] 1-11,16,17,22 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 06, Database accession no. 1982-11061E, XP002123575 & JPS56169859 A 19811226 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM IND CO LDT.) [X] 1-10,16,22 * abstract *