Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1376434

EP1376434 - Delivery module and related platforms for business driven learning solution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2006Refusal of applicationpublished on 25.10.2006  [2006/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Accenture Global Services GmbH
Herrenacker 15
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
[2005/35]
Former [2004/01]For all designated states
Accenture Global Services GmbH
Geschäftshaus Herrenacker 15
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Draper, William Christopher Jr.
205 East 78th Street
New York, NY 10021 / US
02 / Margason, Scott Leigh
7937 South Clayton Circle
Centennial, CO 80122 / US
03 / Garrigan, Heide E.
2075 Hudson Street
Denver, CO 80207 / US
04 / Stovall, Thomas Kenneth
635 Denards Mill
Marietta, GA 30067 / US
05 / Hubbell, John R.
1314 Rosalie Street
Evanston, IL 60201 / US
 [2004/01]
Representative(s)Siniscalco, Fabio , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2004/01]Siniscalco, Fabio , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date03076999.627.06.2003
[2004/01]
Priority number, dateUS20020391929P28.06.2002         Original published format: US 391929 P
US20020391932P28.06.2002         Original published format: US 391932 P
US20020398814P29.07.2002         Original published format: US 398814 P
[2004/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1376434
Date:02.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2004/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/01]
TitleGerman:Ausgabemodul und darauf bezogene Plattformen für geschäftsbedingte Lösungen[2004/01]
English:Delivery module and related platforms for business driven learning solution[2004/01]
French:Module et platforme d'apprentissage d'accord à critéres d' affaires[2004/01]
Examination procedure01.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/31]
09.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
03.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2006Date of oral proceedings
09.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/43]
09.06.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.06.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/43]
Divisional application(s)EP06112968.0  / EP1681650
Request for further processing for:03.06.2005Request for further processing filed
03.06.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.06.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200604   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search