Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1378391

EP1378391 - Vehicle occupant restraint system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.2008
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NHK Spring Co., Ltd.
10, Fukuura 3-chome
Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/18]For all designated states
NHK SPRING CO., LTD.
3-10 Fukuura, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP
Former [2004/02]For all designated states
NHK Spring Co., Ltd.
3-10 Fukuura, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Masuda, Kou, c/o NHK Spring Co., Ltd.
10, Fukuura 3-chome, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-004 / JP
02 / Takeshita, Takashi, c/o NHK Spring Co., Ltd.
10, Fukuura 3-chome, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-004 / JP
03 / Matunaga, Hiroshi, c/o NHK Spring Co., Ltd.
10, Fukuura 3-chome, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-004 / JP
 [2004/02]
Representative(s)Schmitz, Jean-Marie , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
[2006/04]
Former [2004/02]Waxweiler, Jean , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date03077005.130.06.2003
[2004/02]
Priority number, dateJP2002019307302.07.2002         Original published format: JP 2002193073
[2004/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1378391
Date:07.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1378391
Date:12.01.2005
[2005/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1378391
Date:02.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/427
[2004/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2005/39]
Former [2004/02]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeuginsassen-Rückhaltesystem[2004/02]
English:Vehicle occupant restraint system[2004/02]
French:Système de retenue pour les occupants d'un véhicule[2004/02]
Examination procedure29.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/34]
17.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2007Fee for grant paid
21.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.02.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE10011818  (NHK SPRING CO LTD) [Y] 1-8 * column 2, line 16 - line 65; figure - *;
 [Y]DE19961799  (BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECH) [Y] 1-8 * column 1, line 48 - column 3, line 4 * * column 3, line 47 - line 60 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 2; figure - *;
 [A]US2002003365  (YAMAGUCHI HIROYOSHI ET AL) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0020]; figure - *