blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1396519

EP1396519 - Extruded metal containing expandable polystyrene beads [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2008
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYNBRA TECHNOLOGY B.V.
Zeedijk 25
4871 NM Etten-Leur / NL
[2004/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Noordegraaf, Jan
Blauwe Hof 41-01
6602 ZX Wychen / NL
 [2004/11]
Representative(s)Blokland, Arie, et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2004/11]Blokland, Arie, et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau, P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date03077209.914.07.2003
[2004/11]
Priority number, dateNL2002102111019.07.2002         Original published format: NL 1021110
[2004/11]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1396519
Date:10.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1396519
Date:21.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2004
ClassificationIPC:C08J9/00, C08J9/16
[2004/11]
CPC:
C08J9/16 (EP); C08J9/0019 (EP); C08J9/0066 (EP);
C08J9/0095 (EP); C08J2201/03 (EP); C08J2375/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/11]
TitleGerman:Extrudierte expandierbare metallhaltige Polystyrolperlen[2004/11]
English:Extruded metal containing expandable polystyrene beads[2004/11]
French:Perles de polystyrene extrudées, contenant un métal.[2004/11]
Examination procedure08.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/46]
07.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2007Fee for grant paid
07.08.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200503   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2005
31.07.200705   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2007
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE21.11.2007
CH21.11.2007
CY21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
EE21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
LI21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
TR21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
GR22.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
HU22.05.2008
IE14.07.2008
LU14.07.2008
IT31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
[2011/13]
Former [2010/37]BE21.11.2007
CH21.11.2007
CY21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
EE21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
LI21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
TR21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
GR22.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
HU22.05.2008
IE14.07.2008
LU14.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
Former [2010/34]BE21.11.2007
CH21.11.2007
CY21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
EE21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
LI21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
GR22.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
HU22.05.2008
IE14.07.2008
LU14.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
Former [2010/32]BE21.11.2007
CH21.11.2007
CY21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
EE21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
LI21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
GR22.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
IE14.07.2008
LU14.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
Former [2009/34]BE21.11.2007
CH21.11.2007
CY21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
EE21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
LI21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
GR22.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
IE14.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
Former [2009/22]BE21.11.2007
CH21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
EE21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
LI21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
GR22.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
MC31.07.2008
Former [2009/18]BE21.11.2007
CH21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
LI21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
GR22.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
MC31.07.2008
Former [2009/13]BE21.11.2007
CH21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
LI21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
GR22.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
Former [2008/42]BE21.11.2007
CH21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
LI21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
Former [2008/39]BE21.11.2007
CH21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
LI21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
Former [2008/35]CH21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
LI21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
Former [2008/26]CH21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
LI21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
Former [2008/24]CH21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
LI21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE20108311U  (ALCOPOR MAN AG STEINHAUSEN [CH]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, lines 26-30 * * claim - *[A]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.