Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1394834 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 518
09.09.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
07.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.08.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 17
30.08.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.08.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.07.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
06.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.06.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
10.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
08.06.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
08.06.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
08.06.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 92
08.06.2016 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 2
06.06.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
06.06.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
06.06.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
06.06.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
06.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
03.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
03.06.2016 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
03.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
03.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.06.2016 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 2
18.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.03.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
01.03.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
01.03.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
26.02.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
12.11.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
15.11.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.11.2010 Reply to appeal Appeal 4
18.10.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
15.07.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.07.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
01.06.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
12.05.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
09.04.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.03.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
08.03.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
08.03.2010 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
08.03.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
08.03.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.03.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.03.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
08.03.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.12.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.12.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.12.2009 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.12.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.06.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.06.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.06.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.06.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.06.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.06.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
08.06.2009 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2008 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
15.04.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
31.03.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
28.03.2008 General authorisation Opposition 1
28.03.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
18.03.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 6
22.02.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.02.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 6
22.02.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.12.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
03.12.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.11.2007 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.11.2007 Document concerning representation Search / examination 6
16.11.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.11.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.10.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 11
26.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
26.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
26.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
26.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.10.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 12
02.01.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.12.2006 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
15.12.2006 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
15.12.2006 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
04.12.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
04.12.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.12.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
04.12.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
04.12.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.11.2006 Notice concerning a request for amendments/ corrections Search / examination 1
08.11.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
08.11.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.11.2006 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
15.09.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
15.09.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.09.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.09.2006 Translation of priority document Search / examination 1
09.09.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 6
06.09.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 12
06.09.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.09.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
06.09.2006 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.09.2006 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
06.09.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
31.08.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
31.08.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.08.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 6
07.08.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
07.08.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
07.08.2006 Description Search / examination 2
07.08.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.08.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.07.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
07.07.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.12.2005 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
21.12.2005 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.12.2005 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
21.11.2005 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
29.09.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.09.2005 European search report Search / examination 2
18.03.2004 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
18.03.2004 Priority document Search / examination 13
23.02.2004 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
23.01.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
02.09.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
02.09.2003 Description Search / examination 7
02.09.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2003 Drawings Search / examination 2
02.09.2003 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.09.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
01.09.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.09.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
01.09.2003 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 12