Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1394834


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.09.2016 Opposition rejected published on  19.10.2016  [2016/42]
19.07.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.07.2016 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
10.06.2016 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
27.02.2016 Change: Date of oral proceedings
27.02.2016 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.07.2010 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
28.05.2010 Change: Appeal number
21.05.2010 New entry: Appeal number
21.05.2010 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
04.03.2010 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.03.2010 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
04.06.2009 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
11.04.2008 Change - representative published on  14.05.2008  [2008/20]
02.04.2008 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.11.2007 Change - representative published on  02.01.2008  [2008/01]
27.11.2007 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
26.10.2007 Opposition filed published on  28.11.2007  [2007/48]
31.08.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2007  [2007/40]
22.12.2006 (Expected) grant published on  24.01.2007  [2007/04]
13.12.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.12.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.10.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.09.2006 Change - representative published on  18.10.2006  [2006/42]
01.09.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.08.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.07.2006 First examination report published on  09.08.2006  [2006/32]
05.07.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.06.2006 Definitive list of designations published on  19.07.2006  [2006/29]
30.09.2005 Publication of search report published on  16.11.2005  [2005/46]
30.09.2005 Change - classification published on  16.11.2005  [2005/46]
29.09.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.01.2004 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.03.2004  [2004/10]
19.01.2004 Request for examination filed published on  03.03.2004  [2004/10]