Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1394834

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 NLLapse: 24.01.2007
Examination procedure04.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted24.01.2007
Opposition procedure05.07.2016Legal effect of rejection of opposition published on 12.10.2016 
Appeal following opposition12.05.2010APPEAL FILED
12.07.2010APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
05.07.2016APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:03.03.2004 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20030901
 
Event date:03.03.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:03.03.2004 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK
 
Event date:16.11.2005 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7H 01J 37/305 A
 
Event date:16.11.2005 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7G 01N 1/32 B
 
Event date:16.11.2005 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7G 01N 1/42 B
 
Event date:16.11.2005 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7H 01J 37/28 B
 
Event date:16.11.2005 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7H 01J 37/02 B
 
Event date:16.11.2005 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:16.11.2005 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK
 
Event date:19.07.2006 
Event description:PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES
Designated State(s):DE FR GB NL
 
Event date:09.08.2006 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20060707
 
Event date:24.01.2007 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20070124
 
Event date:24.01.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB NL
 
Event date:24.01.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.03.2007 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:60311371
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20070315
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:01.08.2007 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT
 
Event date:03.08.2007 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:28.11.2007 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:CARL ZEISS NTS GMBH
Effective DATE:20071024
 
Event date:17.09.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:05.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R100 60311371 DE
Code Expl.:+EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL
 
Event date:13.07.2016 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)
Opponent Name:CARL ZEISS MICROSCOPY GMBH
Effective DATE:20071024
 
Event date:26.09.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:19.10.2016 
Event description:OPPOSITION REJECTED
Effective DATE:20160705
 
Event date:14.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20170714
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20170830
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20170830
Year of Fee Payment:15