EP1400844 - Photothermographic materials containing high iodide emulsions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maskasky, Joe E. c/o Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Scaccia, Victor P. c/o Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2004/13] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited, Patents Department (W92-3A), Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03077801.3 | 08.09.2003 | [2004/13] | Priority number, date | US20020246265 | 18.09.2002 Original published format: US 246265 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1400844 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1400844 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/498 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
G03C1/49818 (EP,US);
G03C1/49845 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03558 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2005/19] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Photothermographische Materialien enthaltend Hochiodidemulsionen | [2004/13] | English: | Photothermographic materials containing high iodide emulsions | [2004/13] | French: | Matériaux photothermographiques contenant des émulsions à haute teneur en iodide | [2004/13] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 10.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/13] | 31.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3785830 (SULLIVAN M, et al) [X] 1-14 * see claims 1 and 4; column 5, lines 16-57; column 6, lines 3-41, example 10 *; | [X]GB1501005 (EASTMAN KODAK CO) [X] 1-14 * see page 4, lines 64-77 *; | [DX]US5064753 (SOHEI GOTO [JP], et al) [DX] 1-14 * see examples 1-2 (emulsions 1-E and 1-E'); examples 5-6 (emulsions 3-4 and 3-6) *; | [X]US6143488 (UYTTERHOEVEN HERMAN [BE], et al) [X] 1-14 * see claim 1; column 6, lines 7-27 and examples *; | [PX]EP1276007 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-14 * see claims and examples (example 1 (paragraph 324)) *; | [PX]EP1308776 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-14* see examples and claims; example 2 (silver halide emulsion 4) *; | [PX]EP1310825 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-14 * see examples and claims (example 1 (paragraph 285)) * |