blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1403702

EP1403702 - Primer composition for polyesters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.05.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2004/14]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rao, Yuanqiao
Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff 343 State St.
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Majumdar, DeBasis
Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff 343 State St.
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Kress, Robert J.
Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff 343 State St.
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
04 / Decker, David E.
Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff 343 State St.
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
 [2004/14]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/11]Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al
Kodak Limited Patent Department, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2004/14]Weber, Etienne Nicolas
Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date03077897.115.09.2003
[2004/14]
Priority number, dateUS2002025652027.09.2002         Original published format: US 256520
[2004/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1403702
Date:31.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1403702
Date:21.04.2004
[2004/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2004
ClassificationIPC:G03C1/93, B41M5/00, C08L79/02, C09D5/00
[2004/14]
CPC:
C08L79/02 (EP,US); C08J7/0427 (EP,US); C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/044 (EP,US); C08J7/046 (EP,US); C08J7/052 (EP,US);
C08J7/056 (EP,US); C08L89/06 (EP,US); C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
C08J2479/00 (EP,US); C08L21/02 (EP,US); C08L2205/03 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US); Y10T428/2843 (EP,US); Y10T428/2878 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2883 (EP,US); Y10T428/2887 (EP,US); Y10T428/2891 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C08L79/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L79/02, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L79/02, C08L2666/26 (US,EP);
C08L89/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesDE [2005/02]
Former [2004/14]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Grundierungszusammensetzung für Polyester[2004/14]
English:Primer composition for polyesters[2004/14]
French:Composition formant une couche adhésive pour support à base de polyester[2004/14]
Examination procedure25.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/48]
05.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/23]
19.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]SU626074  ;
 [X]US3674726  (KIRK MAHLON RANDALL) [X] 1,3-7 * column 1, line 11 - line 15 * * column 2, line 25 - line 36 * * column 2, line 53 - line 66 * * example 2 * * claims 1,5 *;
 [A]US4438176  (STEINER ROBERT H [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 10 - line 20 * * column 2, line 31 - line 63 * * column 4, line 24 - line 55 * * examples 5-7 * * claim 1 *;
 [L]US5667885  (NGUYEN CHARLES C [US], et al) [L] * column 13, line 8 - line 10 ** The document was cited since it mentions the glass transition temperature of the latex used in example 2 of US-A-3674726 *;
 [A]WO9914275  (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 6 - line 8 * * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 14 * * page 4, line 1 - line 5 * * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 11 * * page 13, line 7 - line 20 * * examples 4,9,10 * * claims 1,4,6-8 *;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 29, Database accession no. 1979-54175B, XP002271590 & SU626074 A 19780824 (NIIMOSSTROI RES INS) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * * table 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.