Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1406440

EP1406440 - System and process for VCR scheduling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.08.2009
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.09.2009  [2009/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Starsight Telecast, Inc.
6922 Hollywood Boulevard
Los Angeles, California 90028 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/01]For all designated states
STARSIGHT TELECAST, INC.
6922 Hollywood Boulevard Los Angeles
California 90028 / US
Former [2004/15]For all designated states
STARSIGHT TELECAST, INC.
39650 Liberty Street, Third Floor
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Young, Patrick
2790 Churchill Drive
Hillsboro, CA 94010 / US
 [2004/15]
Representative(s)Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/15]Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date03078226.210.07.1989
[2004/15]
Priority number, dateUS1988021997115.07.1988         Original published format: US 219971
[2004/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1406440
Date:07.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1406440
Date:06.10.2004
[2004/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/11, H04N5/782
[2004/41]
Former International [2004/15]H04N5/782
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2004/15]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Programmierung eines VCR[2004/15]
English:System and process for VCR scheduling[2004/15]
French:Système et procédé de programmation d'un magnétoscope à cartouche[2004/15]
Examination procedure30.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/22]
12.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/39]
28.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/39]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01113977.1  / EP1160791
EP89909061.7  / EP0424469
EP96202494.9  / EP0763938
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 11
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 12
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 13
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 14
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 15
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 16
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 17
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 18
27.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 19
25.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 20
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:all designated states
Date:26.02.2009
[2009/20]
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE3621263  (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 36 - line 60 * * column 3, line 68 - column 4, line 15 * * column 4, line 28 - line 36 * * column 5, line 33 - line 40 *;
 [Y]US4706121  (YOUNG PATRICK [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 4, line 39 - line 46 * * column 5, line 23 - line 32 * * column 10, line 11 - line 58 *;
 [A]US4723181  (HICKOK WILLIAM K [US]) [A] 1-3,5-7,11-13 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, line 54 - line 64 *