blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1430848

EP1430848 - Cold tip RF/ultrasonic ablation catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cryocor, Inc.
9717 Pacific Heights Boulevard
San Diego, California 92121 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]For all designated states
Cryocor, Inc.
9717 Pacific Heights Boulevard
San Diego, California 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sherman, Marshall
875 Nolbey Street
Cardiff by the Sea, California 92007 / US
02 / Ryba, Eric
3133 Briand Avenue
San Diego, California 92122 / US
03 / Ayers, Gregory M.
P.O.Box 721 7304 Noche Tapatia
Rancho Santa Fe, California 92067 / US
 [2004/26]
Representative(s)Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al
Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2004/26]Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al
c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date03078555.412.11.2003
[2004/26]
Priority number, dateUS2002031837011.12.2002         Original published format: US 318370
[2004/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1430848
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2004
ClassificationIPC:A61B18/02, A61B18/12
[2004/26]
CPC:
A61B18/02 (EP,US); A61B18/24 (KR); A61B17/2202 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US); A61B2018/00023 (EP,US); A61B2018/00273 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0212 (EP,US); A61B2018/0262 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/26]
TitleGerman:RF/Ultraschall Ablationskatheter mit gekühlter Spitze[2004/26]
English:Cold tip RF/ultrasonic ablation catheter[2004/26]
French:Cathéter d'ablation RF/ultrasons à pointe refroidie[2004/26]
Examination procedure05.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/36]
10.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/34]
05.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/34]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200503   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5139496  (HED AHARON Z [US]) [X] 1,5 * abstract ** column 14, lines 13-37 *;
 [X]US5423807  (MILDER FREDRIC L [US]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * column 3, line 37 - column 5, line 10; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO0141664  (CRYOCATH TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 27; figure 1 * * page 8, lines 18-28 * * page 15, lines 17-24 *;
 [X]US6379348  (ONIK GARY M [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * column 1, lines 9-44 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 20; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.