Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1424049

EP1424049 - Multifocal ophthalmic lens [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2010
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AMO Groningen B.V.
P.O. Box 901
9700 AX Groningen / NL
[2006/01]
Former [2004/23]For all designated states
Pharmacia Groningen B.V.
P.O. Box 901
9700 AX Groningen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Piers, Patricia Ann
Steenhouwerskade 44
9718 DD Groningen / NL
02 / Weeber, Hendrik Albert
Veenweg 18 C
9728 NL Groningen / NL
03 / Norrby, Sverker
Landauerlaan 17
9351 PN Leek / NL
 [2004/23]
Representative(s)Rosenquist, Per Olof , et al
Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB
P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/23]Rosenquist, Per Olof , et al
Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date03078764.227.11.2003
[2004/23]
Priority number, dateSE2002000356429.11.2002         Original published format: SE 0203564
[2004/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1424049
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1424049
Date:03.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/16, A61F2/14, G01J9/00, G02C7/02, G02C7/04, G02C7/06, G02B5/18
[2004/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/23]
Extension statesAL27.11.2003
LT27.11.2003
LV27.11.2003
MK27.11.2003
TitleGerman:Multifokale Intraokularlinse[2004/23]
English:Multifocal ophthalmic lens[2004/23]
French:Lentille intraoculaire multifocale[2004/23]
Examination procedure27.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/23]
17.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2009Fee for grant paid
02.03.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09161653.2  / EP2113226
EP10183617.9  / EP2363097
Opposition(s)04.03.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CY03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
DK03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
TR03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
GR04.09.2009
PT03.10.2009
IE27.11.2009
LU27.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
HU04.12.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/31]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
DK03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
GR04.09.2009
PT03.10.2009
IE27.11.2009
LU27.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
HU04.12.2009
Former [2011/21]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
DK03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
GR04.09.2009
PT03.10.2009
IE27.11.2009
LU27.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/46]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
DK03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
GR04.09.2009
PT03.10.2009
IE27.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/30]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
DK03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
PT03.10.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/20]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
DK03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
PT03.10.2009
Former [2010/18]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
PT03.10.2009
Former [2010/16]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
PT03.10.2009
Former [2010/10]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
Former [2010/09]AT03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
Former [2009/51]AT03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
Former [2009/49]AT03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO02088830  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-6,9-14,24-27,35,36,81-88,97,102,103,105-107,132,160,163-165 * page 14, line 1 - page 15, line 34 * * page 18, line 8 - page 18, line 15 * * page 21, line 27 - page 21, line 33; figures 2,3; claims 1,4,9-13 * [A] 7,15-21,39-46,49-54,56,59,62-64,76,77,89-92,98-101,109-112,114-117,119-124,133,138-142,144,145,156,157,161,162,166-170;
 [DY]WO0189424  (PHARMACIA GRONINGEN BV [NL], et al) [DY] 1-149,151-154,156-174 * claims 1-7,10-18,20-22,32-55,68-77,79-81,83,96-105 *;
 [Y]US5225858  (PORTNEY VALDEMAR [US]) [Y] 1-27,32-68,73-124,129-149,156,157,159-170 * column 1, line 12 - column 1, line 58; figures 1,3-6; claims 1,22 *;
 [Y]US5344447  (SWANSON GARY J [US]) [Y] 28-31,69-72,125-128,151-154,158,171-174 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 4; figures 1,4 *;
 [DA]US6457826  (LETT JOHN B W [US]) [DA] 1-174 * figures 1,5; claims 1,18,38 *
by applicantUS4642112
 US5089024
 WO0189424
 WO0076426
 US6457826
 US5968095
 WO0162188
 US4881805