EP1349434 - Lighting circuit, especially for cars [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [2004/48] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states Hella KG Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Studniorz, Josef Hella KG Hueck & Co. Jahnstr. 7 59329, Wadersloh / DE | 02 /
Schulte-Ewersum, Bernd Hella KG Hueck & Co. JHubertusweg 6 59590, Geseke / DE | 03 /
Hinderlich, Andreas Hella KG Hueck & Co. Eichenstrasse 7 58739, Wickede / DE | [2003/40] | Application number, filing date | 03100572.1 | 07.03.2003 | [2003/40] | Priority number, date | DE2002114423 | 30.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10214423 | [2003/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1349434 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1349434 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1349434 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
H05B45/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/19] |
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsschaltkreis, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2003/40] | English: | Lighting circuit, especially for cars | [2003/40] | French: | Circuit d'éclairage, en particulier pour voitures | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 18.02.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.06.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.03.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 25.04.2007 | IT | 25.04.2007 | ES | 05.08.2007 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/21] | GB | 25.04.2007 | |
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 05.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5663719 (DEESE RAYMOND E [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract ** figures 4A,5 *; | [A]US6288497 (CHANG CHIN [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 8 - line 37 * * figure 2B * |