Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1364622

EP1364622 - Elastical system for stabilising the spine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2006
Database last updated on 21.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spinelab AG
Bahnhofstrasse 21
6304 Zug / CH
[2005/38]
Former [2003/48]For all designated states
Spinelab GmbH
Eigenheimstrasse 11
3084 Wabern / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Freudiger, Stefan
Bündackerstrasse 67
3047, Bremgarten b. Bern / CH
 [2003/48]
Representative(s)Scheuzger, Beat Otto
Bovard AG
Patent- und Markenanwälte
Optingenstrasse 16
3000 Bern 25 / CH
[N/P]
Former [2003/48]Scheuzger, Beat Otto
Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16
3000 Bern 25 / CH
Application number, filing date03100604.211.03.2003
[2003/48]
Priority number, dateCH2002000085321.05.2002         Original published format: CH 8532002
[2005/28]
Former [2003/48]CH2002008530221.05.2002
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1364622
Date:26.11.2003
Language:DE
[2003/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1364622
Date:17.12.2003
[2003/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1364622
Date:20.07.2005
Language:DE
[2005/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/70
[2003/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/48]
TitleGerman:Elastisches Stabilisiersystem für Wirbelsäulen[2003/48]
English:Elastical system for stabilising the spine[2003/48]
French:Système élastique pour la stabilisation de la colonne vertébrale[2003/48]
Examination procedure28.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/14]
08.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2005Fee for grant paid
30.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY20.07.2005
CZ20.07.2005
EE20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
IE20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
RO20.07.2005
SI20.07.2005
SK20.07.2005
TR20.07.2005
BG20.10.2005
DK20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
SE20.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
HU21.01.2006
AT11.03.2006
BE31.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2007/46]CZ20.07.2005
EE20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
IE20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
RO20.07.2005
SI20.07.2005
SK20.07.2005
TR20.07.2005
BG20.10.2005
DK20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
SE20.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
HU21.01.2006
AT11.03.2006
BE31.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2007/41]CZ20.07.2005
EE20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
IE20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
RO20.07.2005
SI20.07.2005
SK20.07.2005
TR20.07.2005
BG20.10.2005
DK20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
SE20.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
HU21.01.2006
BE31.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2007/14]CZ20.07.2005
EE20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
IE20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
SI20.07.2005
SK20.07.2005
TR20.07.2005
BG20.10.2005
DK20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
SE20.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
HU21.01.2006
BE31.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2007/13]CZ20.07.2005
EE20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
IE20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
SI20.07.2005
SK20.07.2005
TR20.07.2005
BG20.10.2005
DK20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
SE20.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
BE31.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/52]CZ20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
IE20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
SI20.07.2005
SK20.07.2005
TR20.07.2005
BG20.10.2005
DK20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
SE20.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/46]CZ20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
IE20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
SI20.07.2005
SK20.07.2005
BG20.10.2005
DK20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
SE20.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/29]CZ20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
IE20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
SI20.07.2005
SK20.07.2005
BG20.10.2005
DK20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
SE20.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
Former [2006/26]CZ20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
IE20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
SI20.07.2005
BG20.10.2005
DK20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
SE20.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
Former [2006/25]FI20.07.2005
IE20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
SI20.07.2005
BG20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
SE20.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
Former [2006/14]FI20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
SI20.07.2005
BG20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
SE20.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI20.07.2005
SI20.07.2005
BG20.10.2005
SE20.10.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2718946  (SOPRANE SA [FR]) [X] 1-10,13-17 * abstract *;
 [X]FR2799949  (BENAZZA ABDER [FR]) [X] 1,2,13-15 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0669109  (SULZER MEDIZINALTECHNIK AG [CH], et al) [A] 3,4 * column 2, lines 41-47 * * abstract *;
 [A]EP0346521  (ACROMED CORP [US]) [A] 7,8 * abstract * * column 6, lines 24-41 *;
 [A]DE19951145  (SCHAEFER MICOMED GMBH [DE]) [A] 16 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2745707  (NEUROFIX [FR]) [A] 5,6 * abstract *
by applicantEP0498709
 WO9320771
 EP0516567
 US5282863
 EP0667127
 EP0669109