Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1494126

EP1494126 - Method and Apparatus for the examination of a material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2008
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.09.2010  [2010/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mettler-Toledo AG
Im Langacher
8606 Greifensee / CH
[2007/32]
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
Mettler-Toledo GmbH
Im Langacher, P.O. Box MT-100
8606 Greifensee / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Hütter, Thomas
Rebhaldenweg 6
5443, Niederrohrdorf / CH
02 / Heitz, Christoph
Schulweg 2
8353, Elgg / CH
03 / Schawe, Jürgen
Wiesenstrasse 6
8363 Bichelsee / CH
 [2005/01]
Representative(s)Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys
Patentanwälte
Viktualienmarkt 8
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
Former [2005/06]Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann
Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date03102015.904.07.2003
[2005/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1494126
Date:05.01.2005
Language:DE
[2005/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1494126
Date:29.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/00, G01N25/48
[2005/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/22]
Former [2005/01]AT,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Stoffuntersuchung[2005/01]
English:Method and Apparatus for the examination of a material[2005/01]
French:Procédé et appareil pour analyser un matériau[2007/10]
Former [2005/01]Procédé et appareil pour analyser un materiau
Examination procedure28.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/25]
21.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2007Fee for grant paid
12.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
EE29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
IE29.08.2007
NL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SI29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
TR29.08.2007
BG29.11.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
ES10.12.2007
PT29.01.2008
HU01.03.2008
[2010/37]
Former [2010/34]CY29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
EE29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
IE29.08.2007
NL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SI29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
BG29.11.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
ES10.12.2007
PT29.01.2008
HU01.03.2008
Former [2009/38]CY29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
EE29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
IE29.08.2007
NL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SI29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
BG29.11.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
ES10.12.2007
PT29.01.2008
Former [2009/34]CY29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
EE29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
IE29.08.2007
NL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SI29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
ES10.12.2007
PT29.01.2008
Former [2009/29]CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
EE29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
IE29.08.2007
NL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SI29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
ES10.12.2007
PT29.01.2008
Former [2009/22]CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
EE29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
IE29.08.2007
NL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
ES10.12.2007
PT29.01.2008
Former [2008/28]CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
IE29.08.2007
NL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
ES10.12.2007
PT29.01.2008
Former [2008/25]CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
IE29.08.2007
NL29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
GR30.11.2007
ES10.12.2007
PT29.01.2008
Former [2008/23]DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
IE29.08.2007
NL29.08.2007
GR30.11.2007
ES10.12.2007
Former [2008/22]DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
NL29.08.2007
GR30.11.2007
ES10.12.2007
Former [2008/10]FI29.08.2007
NL29.08.2007
ES10.12.2007
Former [2008/09]NL29.08.2007
ES10.12.2007
Former [2008/08]ES10.12.2007
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4842417  (ASBJORNSEN ODD A) [X] 1,3,4,32 * abstract * * column 6, line 42 - column 9, line 37 * [Y] 33-37;
 [XDY]EP0559362  (TA INSTR INC) [XD] 1,32 * the whole document * [Y] 33-37;
 [X]US5453940  (BROOMHEAD DAVID S ET AL) [X] 1,32 * abstract * * claim 1 *;
 [X]US6092017  (ISHIDA AKIRA ET AL) [X] 1,32 * column 4, line 18 - column 4, line 23 * * column 4, line 36 - column 4, line 44 *;
 [A]JPH10123034  ;
 [A]US5148365  (DEMBO RON S) [A] 1,32 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10123034 A 19980515 (NKK CORP) [A] 1,32 * abstract *