Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1426880

EP1426880 - Support for browsing and continuous browsing of linked contents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.11.2008
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION
3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2008/01]
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation
3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fukatsu, Shinji c/o NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY
CENTER 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi
TOKYO / JP
02 / Tonomura, Yoshinobu c/o NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY
CENTER 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi
TOKYO / JP
03 / Sasaki, Tsutomu c/o NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY
CENTER 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi
TOKYO / JP
04 / Akutsu, Akihito c/o NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY
CENTER 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi
TOKYO / JP
 [2007/46]
Former [2004/24]01 / Fukatsu, Shinji c/o NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY
CENTER 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chom, Musashino-shi
TOKYO / JP
02 / Tonomura, Yoshinobo NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY
CENTER 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chom, Musashino-shi
TOKYO / JP
03 / Sasaki, Tsutomu NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY
CENTER 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chom, Musashino-shi
TOKYO / JP
04 / Akutsu, Akihito NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY
CENTER 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chom, Musashino-shi
TOKYO / JP
Representative(s)Poulin, Gérard
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Poulin, Gérard
Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2004/24]Poulin, Gérard
BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date03104425.827.11.2003
[2004/24]
Priority number, dateJP2002034719629.11.2002         Original published format: JP 2002347196
JP2003027159907.07.2003         Original published format: JP 2003271599
[2004/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1426880
Date:09.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1426880
Date:09.11.2005
[2005/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1426880
Date:02.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2004/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/28]
Former [2004/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Unterstützung für Navigation und kontinuierliche Navigation von verknüpften Inhaltsdaten[2004/24]
English:Support for browsing and continuous browsing of linked contents[2004/24]
French:Support pour navigation et pour navigation continuée de données de contenu liées[2004/24]
Examination procedure27.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/24]
07.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.2006Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2006Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
02.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2007Fee for grant paid
19.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.06.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006BG   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006CZ   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006EE   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006HU   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006RO   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006SI   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006SK   M01   Not yet paid
16.06.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002152222  (HOLBROOK DAVID M) [X] 1-34 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0057] , [0078] - [0102] *;
 [X]US6181838  (KNOWLTON KENNETH CHARLES) [X] 1-34 * abstract * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 40 * * column 12, line 5 - line 35 *;
 [X]  - STANYER D ET AL, "Improving Web usability with the link lens", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990517), vol. 31, no. 11-16, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 1533 - 1544, XP004304572 [X] 1-34 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(99)00034-1
 [X]  - KOPETZKY T ET AL, "Visual preview for link traversal on the World Wide Web", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990517), vol. 31, no. 11-16, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 1525 - 1532, XP004304571 [X] 1-34 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(99)00050-X
 [X]  - WEINREICH H ET AL, "Concepts for improved visualization of Web link attributes", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (200006), vol. 33, no. 1-6, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 403 - 416, XP004304781 [X] 1-34 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(00)00072-4