blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1428570

EP1428570 - Process of transferring particulate solids out of a fluidized bed [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2008
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 19.08.2009  [2009/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2007/15]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Former [2004/25]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Brosten, David Jon
4611 Riverside Oaks Drive
Kingwood, TX 77345 / US
02 / Chen, Ye-Mon
2215 Bent River Drive
Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US
 [2004/25]
Application number, filing date03104465.418.02.2000
[2004/25]
Priority number, dateUS1999025385922.02.1999         Original published format: US 253859
[2004/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1428570
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1428570
Date:11.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2004
ClassificationIPC:B01J8/00, B01J8/24
[2004/25]
CPC:
F23C10/24 (EP,US); C10G11/18 (EP,KR,US); B01J8/0015 (EP,US);
B01J8/003 (EP,US); B01J8/1872 (EP,US); B01J8/28 (EP,US);
C10G11/182 (EP,US); B01J2208/00761 (EP,US); B01J2208/00769 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2004/25]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Entfernung von Teilchen aus einer Wirbelschicht[2004/25]
English:Process of transferring particulate solids out of a fluidized bed[2004/25]
French:Procédé d'extraction de particules solides d'un lit fluidisé[2004/25]
Examination procedure01.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/25]
24.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2006Fee for grant paid
27.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00906353.8  / EP1156873
Opposition(s)14.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
11.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
22.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.04.2007
CH11.04.2007
CY11.04.2007
DK11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
LI11.04.2007
SE11.07.2007
GR12.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
[2009/34]
Former [2008/22]AT11.04.2007
CH11.04.2007
DK11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
LI11.04.2007
SE11.07.2007
GR12.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
Former [2008/08]AT11.04.2007
CH11.04.2007
DK11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
LI11.04.2007
SE11.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
Former [2007/50]AT11.04.2007
CH11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
LI11.04.2007
SE11.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
Former [2007/49]CH11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
LI11.04.2007
SE11.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0457540  (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [X] 8-10 * column 9, line 24 - column 10, line 17; figure 3 *;
 [X]WO9301257  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 8 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5270018  (SCHEUERMAN GEORGIEANNA L [US]) [A] 1-10* figure 2A; claim 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.