blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1431073

EP1431073 - Method for joining axle components [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.03.2006
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.04.2006  [2006/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DANA CORPORATION
4500 Dorr Street
Toledo, OH 43615 / US
[2004/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Durand, Robert D.
P.O. Box 6187
Wyomissing, PA 19610 / US
 [2004/26]
Representative(s)Jorio, Paolo, et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]Jorio, Paolo, Dr. Ing., et al
Studio Torta S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date03104729.316.12.2003
[2004/26]
Priority number, dateUS2002031963516.12.2002         Original published format: US 319635
[2004/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1431073
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1431073
Date:19.01.2005
[2005/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2004
ClassificationIPC:B60B35/16
[2004/26]
CPC:
B60B35/16 (EP,US); B60B2310/218 (EP,US); B60B2310/3028 (EP,US);
B60B2310/316 (EP,US); B60B2360/10 (EP,US); B60B2360/102 (EP,US);
B60B2360/104 (EP,US); B60B2360/147 (EP,US); B60B2360/36 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49622 (EP,US); Y10T29/49909 (EP,US); Y10T29/49913 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Verbinden von Achsbauteilen[2004/26]
English:Method for joining axle components[2004/26]
French:Procédé de raccordement pour des composants d'essieu[2004/26]
Examination procedure20.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/16]
16.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2006/16]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.08.2005M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200503   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP9207506  ;
 [DA]US4129846  (YABLOCHNIKOV B [SU]) [DA] 1,12 * figure -; claim - *;
 [DA]US5966813  (DURAND ROBERT D [US]) [DA] 1,12 * figure -; claim - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP9207506 A 19970812 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantUS5966813
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.