Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1335314

EP1335314 - Automatic advertising campaign management in an online marketplace [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.01.2009
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.01.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.02.2009  [2009/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Overture Services, Inc.
74 North Pasadena Avenue, 3rd Floor
Pasadena, CA 91103 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/33]For all designated states
Overture Services, Inc.
74 North Pasadena Avenue, 3rd Floor
Pasadena, CA 91103 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Singh, Narinder Pal
28 Mirada Road
Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US
02 / Davis, Darren J.
1571 Sekio Street
Rowland Hights, CA 91748 / US
 [2003/33]
Representative(s)McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/33]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date03250822.810.02.2003
[2003/33]
Priority number, dateUS2002007222008.02.2002         Original published format: US 72220
[2003/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1335314
Date:13.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2003/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/33]
Extension statesAL12.02.2004
LT12.02.2004
LV12.02.2004
MK12.02.2004
RO12.02.2004
TitleGerman:Automatische Verwaltung von Werbekampagnen auf einem virtuellen Marktplatz[2003/33]
English:Automatic advertising campaign management in an online marketplace[2003/33]
French:Gestion automatique d'une campagne de publicité dans un marché en ligne[2003/33]
Examination procedure12.02.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/16]
07.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.08.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/09]
23.09.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search