blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1341362

EP1341362 - Hands free audio kit for helmet wearers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.03.2005  [2005/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hosiden Besson Limited
St. Joseph's Close, 11 Hove
East Susseex BN3 7EZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/36]For all designated states
Hosiden Besson Limited
St. Joseph's Close, 11
Hove, East Susseex BN3 7EZ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Parmley, Charles Richard Colin
North House, 5 Stair Road
Tonbridge, Kent TN10 4HB / GB
02 / Jupp, Stephen David John
22 Harding Avenue
Eastbourne, East Sussex BN22 8SY / GB
 [2003/36]
Representative(s)Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al
Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables
Massetts Road
Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/36]Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al
Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road
Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
Application number, filing date03251105.725.02.2003
[2003/36]
Priority number, dateGB2002000458127.02.2002         Original published format: GB 0204581
[2003/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1341362
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1341362
Date:10.12.2003
[2003/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2003
ClassificationIPC:H04M1/60, A42B3/30, H04B1/38
[2003/36]
CPC:
H04M1/6058 (EP); A42B3/30 (EP); H04M1/05 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/36]
Former [2003/36]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Freisprechaudiokit für den Träger eines Helmes[2003/36]
English:Hands free audio kit for helmet wearers[2003/36]
French:Kit audio mains-libres pour porteur de casque[2003/36]
Examination procedure12.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/10]
05.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/10]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.07.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004BG   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004CZ   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004EE   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004HU   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004SI   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004SK   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.07.2004M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH06309708  ;
 [X]JPH01122922  ;
 [X]JP2001251404  ;
 [X]US4152553  (WHITE MAYNARD E [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]GB2295291  (BURDEN PETER [GB]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19638027  (GUENTHER ELSTER INNOVATIONS UN [DE]) [X] 2,7-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0001264  (NEW TRANSDUCERS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 2,3 * abstract * * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 10; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO0172084  (NEWLANDS TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9 * abstract * * page 4, line 16 - line 22 * * page 21, line 28 - page 22, line 8; figure 14 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, & JP06309708 A 19941104 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-3,7 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890815), vol. 013, no. 367, Database accession no. (C - 626), & JP01122922 A 19890516 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020701), vol. 2000, no. 26, & JP2001251404 A 20010914 (TOKIN CORP) [X] 2 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.